Christodoulou v. Springfield Terminal Railway Company
Plaintiff: Nickolaos Christodoulou
Defendant: Springfield Terminal Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01159
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/11/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Initial Conference set for 12/18/2019 10:30 AM in before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (mgh)
September 20, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order. The text of the General Order 25 was modified to reflect the Initial Conference will be held on 12/18/2019 at 10:30 AM and the Civil Case Management Plan and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged on or before 12/11/2019. (mgh)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/18/2019 10:30 AM in Syracuse US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/11/2019. All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh) Modified on 9/20/2019 (mgh, ).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Springfield Terminal Railway Company. (mgh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Springfield Terminal Railway Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4876225) filed by Nickolaos Christodoulou. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christodoulou v. Springfield Terminal Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickolaos Christodoulou
Represented By: Robert T. Naumes, Sr.
Represented By: Christopher C. Naumes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springfield Terminal Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?