Pleasure Boat Cruises 2 LLC v. Captain J.P. Cruise, Inc.
Defendant: New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC
Petitioner: Captain J.P. Cruise, Inc., Pleasure Boat Cruises 2 LLC and Captain J.P. Cruise Line, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01179
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
2 Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 0183
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Tele-Conference: A Telephone Status Conference has been set for Wednesday, 12/4/2019 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel to address the pending motion for a protective order, as well as case deadlines for both this and the related case. Parties are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and security code 1234# to join the call. (tab)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Clerk's Notice of Complaint served on Potential Claimants on October 7, 2019, filed by Captain J.P. Cruise Line, Inc., Pleasure Boat Cruises 2 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Affidavit from Albany Times Union)(Rouffet, Carole)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting the #5 Notice of related case. In the interest of judicial economy, this case is deemed related to 1:19-cv-832 BKS/CFH. This Court is already assigned to both cases 1:19-cv-832 BKS/CFH and 1:19-cv-1179 BKS/DJS and will remain the presiding Judge for both cases. Case 1:19-cv-1179 is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart is no longer assigned to this case. SO ORDERED by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 11/12/2019. (rjb, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC.(Carton, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Notice of Related Case by Captain J.P. Cruise Line, Inc., Pleasure Boat Cruises 2 LLC submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes . Objections due by 10/9/2019 (Rouffet, Carole)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER APPROVING THE AD INTERIM STIPULATION FOR VALUE, DIRECTING NOTICE TO ISSUE AND ENJOINING SUITS AND DIRECTING THE FILING OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 10/1/2019. (rjb, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY. (rjb, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Captain J.P. Cruise Line, Inc., Pleasure Boat Cruises 2 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Guerric Russell, #2 Exhibit(s) 1 - Proposed Notice, #3 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Russell, Guerric)
September 24, 2019 Notice re: Compliance with General Order #12: Pursuant to General Order #12, counsel is required to file the Notice of Related Case form as a separate document. Refer to the Court's website: www.nynd.uscourts.gov for further instructions. Counsel may access the fillable form using the following link: www.nynd.uscourts.gov/content/general-order-12 (mgh)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROMOR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4881002) filed by Pleasure Boat Cruises 2 LLC, Captain J.P. Cruise, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pleasure Boat Cruises 2 LLC v. Captain J.P. Cruise, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Captain J.P. Cruise, Inc.
Represented By: Carole Rouffet
Represented By: Guerric S.D.L. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pleasure Boat Cruises 2 LLC
Represented By: Carole Rouffet
Represented By: Guerric S.D.L. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Captain J.P. Cruise Line, Inc.
Represented By: Carole Rouffet
Represented By: Guerric S.D.L. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Carton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?