West Coast Servicing, Inc. v. Giammichele et al
Plaintiff: West Coast Servicing, Inc.
Defendant: Mark A. Giammichele, Sherry A. Giammichele, Vassar Brothers Hospital, Sherry A. Whitman, American Express Bank, FSB, Mark Giammichele and Sherry Anne Polinsky
Case Number: 1:2019cv01193
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 TEXT NOTICE regarding Motion #13 for Default Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale : Any response to this motion is due by 11/26/2019. Reply to this Motion is due by 12/3/2019. This motion is taken on submission of the papers and returnable before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. No appearances are required. (Served Sherry Giammichele (a/k/a Sherry A. Whitman a/k/a Sherry Anne Polinsky) and Mark A. Giammichele at 55 Sundale Road, Accord, NY 12404), as well as American Express Bank, FSB at 28 Liberty St., New York, NY 10005 and 4315 S. 2700 West, Salt Lake City, UT 84148, and Vassar Brothers Hospital at 1351 Route 55, Lagrangeville, NY 12540). (sal) Modified on 11/13/2019 to include this was served on Vassar Brothers Hospital, as well. (sal ).
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Motion for Default Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale with supporting papers and exhibits served on all Defendants on November 12, 2019, filed by West Coast Servicing, Inc.. (Weinreb, Alan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale filed by West Coast Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Regularity in Support of Default Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 proposed Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale Order, #4 Exhibit 'A', #5 Exhibit 'B', #6 Exhibit 'C') (Weinreb, Alan)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER : According to the docket, clerks entry of default has been entered as to the defendants in this matter. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to either file a motion for default judgment or a status report on or before 12/2/2019. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 10/31/2019. (sal )
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Vassar Brothers Hospital re #10 Request for Entry of Default. (sfp, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Vassar Brothers Hospital by West Coast Servicing, Inc.. (Weinreb, Alan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to American Express Bank, FSB, Mark A. Giammichele, Sherry A. Giammichele in regards to #8 Request for Entry of Default. (sfp, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to American Express Bank, FSB, Mark A. Giammichele, Sherry A. Giammichele, Vassar Brothers Hospital by West Coast Servicing, Inc.. (Weinreb, Alan)
October 15, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Mark A. Giammichele answer due 10/23/2019; Sherry A. Giammichele answer due 10/23/2019. Both defts were served on 10/2/19 not 10/10/19 as doc's 6 & 7 stated in the text. (sfp, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast Servicing, Inc.. Sherry A. Giammichele served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast Servicing, Inc.. Mark A. Giammichele served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast Servicing, Inc.. Vassar Brothers Hospital served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast Servicing, Inc.. American Express Bank, FSB served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by West Coast Servicing, Inc.. (sfp, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Express Bank, FSB, Mark A. Giammichele, Sherry A. Giammichele, Vassar Brothers Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(sfp, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4883292) filed by West Coast Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Certificate of Merit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Coast Servicing, Inc. v. Giammichele et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Giammichele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry A. Giammichele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vassar Brothers Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry A. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Giammichele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Anne Polinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Coast Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Alan H. Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?