Quackenbush v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John J. Quackenbush, Jr.
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Research & Development LLC and Janssen Ortho LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01237
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY - After confirming with the filing user, Dkt. No. 13 was deleted as it was filed in error. Filing user confirmed that document was refiled in District of New Jersey case no. 3:19-cv-19918. (dpk)
November 6, 2019 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 3:19-cv-19918, filed 11/06/2019. (plp)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #35. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2750 Invokana (Canagliflozin) Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Brian R. Martinotti, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
November 1, 2019 Case transferred electronically to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2750 Invokana (Canagliflozin) Products Liability Litigation. (plp)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Copy of General Order 25, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Service of Summons (2) and pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Janssen Ortho on 10/16/2019, filed by John J. Quackenbush, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Notice of Lawsuit and request to waive service of summons, #2 Exhibit(s) waiver of service)(Wolford, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Copy of General Order 25, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Service of Summons (2) and pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 10/16/2019, filed by John J. Quackenbush, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Notice of Lawsuit and request to waive service of summons, #2 Exhibit(s) waiver of service)(Wolford, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Copy of General Order 25, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Service of Summons (2) and pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Janssen Research & Development, LLC on 10/16/2019, filed by John J. Quackenbush, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Notice of Lawsuit and request to waive service of summons, #2 Exhibit(s) waiver of service)(Wolford, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Copy of General Order 25, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Service of Summons (2) and pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Johnson & Johnson on 10/16/2019, filed by John J. Quackenbush, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Notice of Lawsuit and request to waive service of summons, #2 Exhibit(s) waiver of service)(Wolford, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Copy of General Order 25, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Service of Summons (2) and pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Janssen Ortho on October 16, 2019, filed by John J. Quackenbush, Jr. (Wolford, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Copy of General Order 25, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Service of Summons (2) and pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on October 16, 2019, filed by John J. Quackenbush, Jr. (Wolford, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Copy of General Order 25, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Service of Summons (2) and pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Janssen Research & Development, LLC on October 16, 2019, filed by John J. Quackenbush, Jr. (Wolford, Kelly)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Copy of General Order 25, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Summons (2), pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Johnson & Johnson on October 16, 2019, filed by John J. Quackenbush, Jr. (Wolford, Kelly)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC and Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Janssen Research & Development LLC, #2 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons Issued as to Janssen Ortho LLC)(dpk)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 2:00 PM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/30/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC and Johnson & Johnson (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4898477) filed by John J. Quackenbush, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quackenbush v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Quackenbush, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly Wolford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?