Argonaut Insurance Company v. City of Troy, New York
Plaintiff: Argonaut Insurance Company
Defendant: City of Troy, New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv01247
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #8 Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim. Corrected the docket text and parties to reflect that counter-defendant is Argonaut Insurance Company. (dpk)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Argonaut Insurance Company by City of Troy, New York.(Ginsberg, Michael) Modified on 11/27/2019 (dpk).
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William F Stewart on behalf of Argonaut Insurance Company (Stewart, William)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Ginsberg on behalf of City of Troy, New York (Ginsberg, Michael)
October 28, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for City of Troy, New York answer due 11/14/2019. (dpk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on City of Troy, New York on October 23, 2019, filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Smith, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Smith, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Troy, New York. (dpk)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/31/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Troy, New York (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4902103) filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Insurance Policy), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argonaut Insurance Company v. City of Troy, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Troy, New York
Represented By: Michael E. Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argonaut Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael J Smith
Represented By: William F Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?