Nigro v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rayn Nigro
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc., Phillip Morris USA, Inc., Pax Labs, Inc. and Altria Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01268
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
2 Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-07188, filed 10/31/2019. (amt)
October 29, 2019 Case transferred electronically to Northern District of California for inclusion into MDL-2913 Juul Labs, Inc., Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation. (plp)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #4. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed; ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of California for inclusion into MDL-2913 Juul Labs, Inc., Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. William H. Orrick, III, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the undersigned disqualifies himself from assignment to this case in accordance with General Order 12(G)(8) and 28 U.S.C. 455 (a), (b), and it is further ORDERED, that in accordance with General Order 12(G)(8). Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart for all further proceedings in a referred role. District Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. remains the Presiding Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 10/21/2019. (pjh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Rayn Nigro Notice of Potential Tag Along Action filed in the JPML (Relkin, Ellen)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT; Attorney Neil D. Overholtz; Attorney Nicole Guntner; Attorney Nathan C. Bess. Email address is Noverholtz@awkolaw.com. Phone number is 850-202-1010. Admissions due by 10/30/2019. (pjh) Modified on 10/17/2019 {Clerk served notice via regular mail on 10/16/2019} (pjh).
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/8/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JUUL Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Pax Labs, Inc., #2 Summons Issued as to Altria Group, Inc., #3 Summons Issued as to Phillip Morris USA, Inc.)(pjh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Altria Group, Inc., JUUL Labs, Inc., Pax Labs, Inc. and Phillip Morris USA, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4908810) filed by Rayn Nigro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nigro v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayn Nigro
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Morris USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pax Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?