Graham-Johnson et al v. City of Albany et al
Plaintiff: Lenora Graham, Jerome Johnson and Shirley Graham-Johnson
Defendant: Richard LaJoy, R. Russell Reeves, John Doe, City of Albany, Daniel Sherman, Valerie Scott and M. Cristo, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01274
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2020 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Judge Brenda K. Sannes Response to Motion due by 12/30/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/6/2020. filed by R. Russell Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law) (Walsh, David)
December 11, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW Sur-Reply filed by Lenora Graham, Shirley Graham-Johnson, Jerome Johnson. (Deinhart, Brian)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of M. Cristo, Inc.'s Crossclaim Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2020 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Judge Brenda K. Sannes Response to Motion due by 12/27/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/2/2020. filed by City of Albany, Richard LaJoy, Valerie Scott, Daniel Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law) (Magee, Robert)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Letter Request. Plaintiffs may file a sur-reply, of no more than 5 pages, by 12/16/2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 12/9/2019. (rjb, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 Letter Motion from Plaintiffs for Lenora Graham, Shirley Graham-Johnson, Jerome Johnson requesting Permission to file Sur-Reply in Motion to Dismiss submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes . (Deinhart, Brian)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Albany, Richard LaJoy, Valerie Scott, Daniel Sherman. (Magee, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lenora Graham, Shirley Graham-Johnson, Jerome Johnson. (Deinhart, Brian)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Request from David Walsh, Esq. for R. Russell Reeves, R. Russell Reeves requesting Extension: R. Russell Reeves answer due 12/15/2019. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/22/2019. (tab)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 Letter Motion from David Walsh, Esq. for R. Russell Reeves, R. Russell Reeves requesting Extension submitted to Judge Sannes . (Walsh, David)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Walsh, IV on behalf of R. Russell Reeves (Walsh, David)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW In Opposition to Co-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by M. Cristo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bernstein, Jonathan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED ANSWER to , CROSSCLAIM against City of Albany, R. Russell Reeves, Valerie Scott, Daniel Sherman by M. Cristo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernstein, Jonathan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against City of Albany, R. Russell Reeves, Valerie Scott, Daniel Sherman by M. Cristo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernstein, Jonathan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for January 14, 2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on the dispositive motion. (tab)
November 12, 2019 TEXT NOTICE to Attorney Jonathan Bernstein, re #7 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. The answer to the complaint skips paragraphs 55-60. Please re-file if the answer is incomplete or submit a letter advising the Court that paragraphs 55-60 are not supposed to be included in the answer. (see)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against City of Albany, R. Russell Reeves, Valerie Scott, Daniel Sherman by M. Cristo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernstein, Jonathan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2019 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Judge Brenda K. Sannes Response to Motion due by 12/2/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/9/2019. filed by City of Albany, Richard LaJoy, Valerie Scott, Daniel Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law) (Magee, Robert)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Bernstein on behalf of M. Cristo, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernstein, Jonathan)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mike Cristo, R. Russell Reeves, City of Albany, Richard LaJoy, Daniel Sherman, Valerie Scott on 10/21/2019 and 10/17/2019, filed by Shirley Graham-Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Affidavit of Service, #5 Affidavit of Service)(Deinhart, Brian)
October 25, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for City of Albany answer due 11/7/2019; Richard LaJoy answer due 11/7/2019; Valerie Scott answer due 11/7/2019; Daniel Sherman answer due 11/7/2019. (khr)
October 25, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for M. Cristo, Inc. answer due 11/12/2019; R. Russell Reeves answer due 11/12/2019. (khr)
October 17, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue a summons for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendant, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (see)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/7/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to City of Albany, Richard LaJoy, M. Cristo, Inc., R. Russell Reeves, Valerie Scott, and Daniel Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Richard LaJoy, #2 Summons for Daniel Sherman, #3 Summons for Valerie Scott, #4 Summons for R. Russell Reeves, #5 Summons for M. Cristo, Inc.)(see)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of Albany, John Doe, Richard LaJoy, M. Cristo, Inc., R. Russell Reeves, Valerie Scott, and Daniel Sherman (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4909595) filed by Jerome Johnson, Shirley Graham-Johnson, and Lenora Graham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham-Johnson et al v. City of Albany et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard LaJoy
Represented By: Robert G. Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Russell Reeves
Represented By: David H. Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albany
Represented By: Robert G. Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Sherman
Represented By: Robert G. Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Scott
Represented By: Robert G. Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Cristo, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenora Graham
Represented By: Brian Deinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Johnson
Represented By: Brian Deinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Graham-Johnson
Represented By: Brian Deinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?