Sickler v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Beverly J. Sickler
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01356
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Monsanto Company answer due 12/13/2019. (pjh)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Beverly J. Sickler. (Jordan, Laura)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, General Order 25, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Service of Summons(2) and Pre-paid return envelope served on Monsanto Company on 11/12/2019, filed by Beverly J. Sickler. (Jordan, Laura)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/28/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (pjh)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4931913) filed by Beverly J. Sickler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sickler v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly J. Sickler
Represented By: Laura M. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?