Riding High Dude Ranch, Inc. v. National Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Riding High Dude Ranch, Inc.
Defendant: National Casualty Company
Not Yet Classified: Carolyn B. George
Case Number: 1:2019cv01390
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Carolyn B. George has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Martin A. Lynn and Eric Cheng. Dated: 1/6/2020(Lynn, Martin)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MANDATORY MEDIATION PROGRAM: This case is referred to participation in the Mandatory Mediation Program. The parties should refer to General Order #47. The deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 4/30/2020. The deadline for the parties file a Stipulation selecting a Mediator is 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/13/2019. (mab)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5 Days. Joinder of Parties due by 2/3/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/3/2020. Discovery due by 11/23/2020. Motions to be filed by 12/31/2020. The Court has discussed Mandatory Mediation with the parties and will issue a separate Order referring this action into the Mandatory Mediation Program. The deadline to complete Mandatory Mediation is 4/30/2020. Status Report due by 3/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/13/2019. (mab)
December 11, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart: Rule 16 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/11/2019. Appearances: Martin Lynn, Esq. for Plaintiff; Eric Chen, Esq. for Defendant. The Court hears from counsel as to their positions and how they intend to proceed in this matter. Mandatory Disclosures have been exchanged. The Court discusses the Mandatory Mediation Program with counsel. Scheduling Order deadlines set. A Uniform Pretrial Order will be issued. (TIME: 9:45AM-10:01AM). (mab)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 Initial Conference in this matter is RESCHEDULED as to TIME ONLY and is now set for December 11, 2019 at 10:00 AM before the undersigned. Counsel are directed to appear IN PERSON at the James T. Foley US Courthouse, 445 Broadway, 4th Floor, Room 409, Albany, NY on the scheduled date and time. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/6/2019. (mab)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Riding High Dude Ranch, Inc.. (Lynn, Martin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by National Casualty Company.(Cheng, Eric)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Casualty Company. (Cheng, Eric)
November 13, 2019 ***Answer deadline set for National Casualty Company to 11/18/2019. (jmb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/4/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT: relating to the #1 Notice of Removal, filed by National Casualty Company. (jmb)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: from NYS Surpreme Court, County of Warren, case number EF2019-67363 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4938706) filed by National Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - State Court Service of Process and Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riding High Dude Ranch, Inc. v. National Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Casualty Company
Represented By: Eric Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riding High Dude Ranch, Inc.
Represented By: Martin A. Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Carolyn B. George
Represented By: Carolyn B. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?