Hinton v. Saul
Plaintiff: Lakeisha S. Hinton
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01395
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Lakeisha S. Hinton advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Binder, Charles)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart for all further proceedings. Parties have not consented. Authorized by the Chief Judge pursuant to General Order #18. (drm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Candace Lawrence appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 2/11/2020. (Lawrence, Candace)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 12/4/2019. (khr)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court and will be removed from the docket upon the filing of the Administrative Transcript. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (khr)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4938673). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Administrative Law Judge Decision, #2 Exhibit - Appeals Council Decision, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinton v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeisha S. Hinton
Represented By: Charles E. Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Candace Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?