Melville v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Joanne M. Melville
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01407
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 3:19-cv-20971, filed 12/03/2019. (amt)
December 4, 2019 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 3:19-cv-20971, filed 12/03/2019. (plp)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #184. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2738 Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Freda L. Wolfson, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
December 3, 2019 Case transferred electronically to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2738 Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. (plp)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Actions by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (dpk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/4/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Johnson & Johnson on 11/14/2019 by Joanne M. Melville. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Waiver of Service to Defendants)(hmr)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4942740) filed by Joanne M. Melville. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melville v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne M. Melville
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?