New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC
Petitioner: New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01411
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC Affirmation of Service and Publication of Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Carton, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability served on New York State Department of Transportation on 1/6/2020, filed by New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC. (Carton, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Letter of Undertaking BOND in the amount of $ 685,000.00 as to New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC posted by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America ; (Original Bond retained by filing attorney). (Carton, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Maritime Highway's proposed bond of $686,000.00 through a letter of undertaking by Travelers is approved; Maritime Highway is directed to post the $686,000.00 through Travelers; Maritime Highway must submit proof of bond with the Clerk of Court no later than 12:00 p.m. Monday, December 2, 2019; All civil actions against Maritime Highway related to the September 16, 2017 crash must cease; Maritime Highway is directed to serve notice of this action to claimant NYSDOT; Claimant NYSDOT is directed to assert a claim against Maritime Highway or contest petitioner's right to limitation or exoneration by 12:00 p.m. on Monday, December 23, 2019; Pursuant to Local Rule of the Northern District of New York 77.5 and Supplemental Local Rule of Procedure for Admiralty and Maritime Cases G(g)(1), Maritime Highway is directed to publish notice of this action for limitation or exoneration the Times Record of Troy, New York every Friday, beginning November 29, 2019, and continuing until December 20, 2019; and Pursuant to Rule F(4), Maritime Highway is directed to mail a copy of that notice to every known claimant by Friday, December 6, 2019. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 11/21/19. (kmp)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (Filing fee $400 receipt number BNYNDC- 4943913) filed by New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New York State Marine Highway Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Carton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?