V. G. v. G6 Hospitality, LLC
Plaintiff: V. G.
Defendant: G6 Hospitality, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01520
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 14 JPMDL ORDER DENYING TRANSFER. Ordered that the motion for centralization into MDL-2928 is DENIED. (plp)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shannon E. Dudic, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/31/2020. (tab)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Angela C. Agrusa, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/31/2020. (tab)
January 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shannon E. Dudic Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5013865. filed by G6 Hospitality, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey D. Kuhn, #2 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice for Shannon E. Dudic, #4 Certificate of Good Standing for Shannon E. Dudic, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Admission Order for Shannon E. Dudic) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Kuhn, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Angela C. Agrusa Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5013849. filed by G6 Hospitality, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey D. Kuhn, #2 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice of Angela C. Agrusa, #4 Certificate of Good Standing for Angela C. Agrusa, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Admission Order for Angela C. Agrusa) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Kuhn, Jeffrey)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 COPY OF REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW: filed with the MDL in further support of the #5 Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Southern District of Ohio, filed by Paul J. Pennock, Esq., Kimberly L. Adams, Esq., and Kimberly A. Dougherty, Esq., on behalf of plaitniff V. G. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jmb)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER approving #7 Stipulation filed by G6 Hospitality, LLC. Answer due date updated for G6 Hospitality, LLC answer due 2/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/9/2020. (tab)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time by G6 Hospitality, LLC submitted to Judge Scullin. (Kuhn, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE: filed by the Weitz & Luxenberg Law Firm on behalf of V.G. regarding the #5 Copy of Schedule of Actions before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit 24, #2 Amended Exhibit 1, #3 Amended Exhibit 2, #4 Amended Exhibit 22, #5 Amended Exhibit 20, #6 Mailing Envelope) {Attachments were scanned in the Order that they were received.} (jmb)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 COPY OF SCHEDULE OF ACTIONS BEFORE THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION: filed by the Weitz & Luxenberg Law Firm on behalf of Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Southern District of Ohio, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Statement of Oral Argument, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Proof of Service, #29 Mailing Envelope) (jmb) Modified on 12/19/2019 to correct the file date to 12/13/2019. (jmb)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/2/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to G6 Hospitality, LLC. (hmr)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously with Memorandum in Support filed by V. G.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (hmr)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against G6 Hospitality, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4966460) filed by V. G. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: V. G. v. G6 Hospitality, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. G.
Represented By: Paul J. Pennock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G6 Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?