State of New York v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: State of New York
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, National Foam, Inc., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company, Tyco Fire Products, LP, 3M Company, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., The Chemours Company, Amerex Corporation, Fire Service Plus, Inc. and Chemguard, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01541
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:20-cv-00048, filed 01/06/2020. (plp)
January 6, 2020 Case transferred electronically to District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL-2873 (plp)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #21. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL-2873 Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Richard M. Gergel, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE as to Attorney Jonathan I. Handler re #4 Notice of Admission Requirement. Attorney Handler does not intend to remain as counsel of record. Attorney John W. Cerreta filed a #7 Notice of Appearance on behalf of defendant Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. {With copy of Notice of Admission Requirement and envelope attached}. (kmp)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Cerreta on behalf of Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. (Cerreta, John)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Letter Request from Nicole G. McDonough for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP requesting Adjourment of Deadlines Pending Decision on JPML Transfer. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 12/23/2019. (tab)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Request Letter Motion from Nicole G. McDonough for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP requesting Adjourment of Deadlines Pending Decision on JPML Transfer submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby . (McDonough, Nicole)
December 13, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk notes that Assistant Attorney Generals Brendan S. McGrath, Lisa M. Burianek, and Matthew J. Sinkman addresses listed on CM/ECF differ than what is listed on the Certificate of Service from the Notice of Removal. If CM/ECF needs to be updated the attorneys are directed to do so. (kmp)
December 13, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Tyco Fire Products, LP answer due 12/19/2019 and Chemguard, Inc. answer due 12/19/2019. (kmp)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Defendants; Attorney Michael L. Carpenter, Email address is mcarpenter@gastonlegal.com. Phone number is 706-865-4400 and Attorney Jonathan I. Handler, Email address is jhandler@daypitney.com. Phone number is 617-345-4600. Admissions due by 12/27/2019. Copies served upon attorneys by regular mail on 12/13/19. (Attachments: #1 Admission Requirement as to Party Defendant; Attorney Jonathan I. Handler)(kmp)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In Person Rule 16 Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/9/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products, LP. (kmp)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albany County Supreme Court, case number 907664-19 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4971706) filed by Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New York v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Represented By: Keith E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products, LP
Represented By: Nicole G. McDonough
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Represented By: Thomas J Herten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Andrew Calica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Represented By: John W Cerreta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Service Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole G. McDonough
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Represented By: Thomas J Herten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Brendan S. McGrath
Represented By: Philip M. Bein
Represented By: Matthew J. Sinkman
Represented By: Lisa M. Burianek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?