Chery v. Conduent Education Services, LLC et al
Petitioner: Jeffrey Chery
Respondent: Conduent Education Services, LLC, AccessLex Institute and Access Funding 2015-1, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019mc00055
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (Filing Fee PAID $47 receipt number AWIEDC-3217192) filed by Jeffrey Chery. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eagel, Lawrence)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (Filing Fee PAID $47 receipt number AWIEDC-3217192) filed by Jeffrey Chery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Eagel, Lawrence)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin A. Kuehn on behalf of Jeffrey Chery (Kuehn, Justin)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence P. Eagel on behalf of Jeffrey Chery (Eagel, Lawrence)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:19-mc-00033. electronically transferred when case opened
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/1/2019 APPROVING #2 stipulation to transfer case and TRANSFERRING case to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York. (cc: all counsel)(cb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Transferring Matter to U.S. District Court for the N.D.N.Y. by Access Funding 2015-1 LLC, AccessLex Institute, Conduent Education Services LLC. (Fanaselle, Daniel) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (Filing Fee PAID $47 receipt number AWIEDC-3217192) (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Declaration in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fanaselle, Daniel) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/14/2019.]
September 13, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (Filing Fee PAID $47 receipt number AWIEDC-3217192) filed by AccessLex Institute, f/k/a Access Group, Inc., Access Funding 2015-1, LLC, Conduent Education Services, LLC ; The Brief in Support and the Declaration to this document should have been filed as separate entries. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chery v. Conduent Education Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Conduent Education Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Christopher Fanaselle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AccessLex Institute
Represented By: Daniel Christopher Fanaselle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Access Funding 2015-1, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Christopher Fanaselle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Chery
Represented By: Lawrence P. Eagel
Represented By: Justin A. Kuehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?