Geiger v. PHH Mortgage-Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Respondent: Jeffrey Grabowski, Shehzad Sayed, Bernice Gerosaga, PHH Mortgage-Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Ras Citron LLC, Everbank and William Blake Wilson
Claimant: Jordan Mark Geiger
Case Number: 1:2019mc00057
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN FINAL JUDGMENT/ARBITRATION by Jordan Mark Geiger (khr)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Jordan Mark Geiger re #2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(khr)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Claimant's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award, Dkt. No. 2, and Motion for Order of Service, Dkt. No. 3. The Court notes that there appear to be several irregularities in Claimant's submissions, including whether Claimant's choice of venue is proper. Therefore, as an initial matter, the Court directs Claimant, by January 3, 2020, to submit a letter to the Court explaining why filing suit in the Northern District of New York satisfies the requirements of 9 U.S.C. 9. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on December 17, 2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(sas)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR ORDER OF SERVICE filed by Jordan Mark Geiger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (dpk)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Jordan Mark Geiger. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Confirmation and Enforcement of Arbitration Award, #2 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Mailing Envelope) (dpk)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 Resolution to Dispute Resolution Complaint by Jordan Mark Geiger (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Mailing Envelope) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geiger v. PHH Mortgage-Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Grabowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shehzad Sayed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bernice Gerosaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PHH Mortgage-Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ras Citron LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Everbank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Blake Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jordan Mark Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?