Dubois v. Beaury et al
Plaintiff: Brian Dubois
Defendant: Robert Beaury, Estate of Harry Corbitt, Ronald Moore II, Town of Germantown and Paul Czajka
Case Number: 1:2020cv00086
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Letter Request for an extension of the motion response and reply deadlines re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion deadlines have been reset as follows : Motion Hearing reset for 5/22/2020 on submit. Response to Motion now due by 5/7/2020 Reply to Response to Motion now due by 5/14/2020.. IT IS SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 3/17/2020. (bjw, )
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Second Letter Motion from Peter Schuyler for Brian Dubois requesting Adjournment of motion schedule submitted to Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. . (Schuyler, Peter)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Letter Request for an extension of the response and reply deadlines re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing reset for 4/10/2020 on submit before Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin Jr. Response to Motion now due by 3/23/2020. Reply to Response to Motion now due by 3/30/2020.. IT IS SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 2/18/2020. (bjw, )
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 First Letter Motion from Peter Schuyler for Brian Dubois requesting Adjournment of motion schedule submitted to Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. . (Schuyler, Peter)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Schuyler on behalf of Brian Dubois (Schuyler, Peter)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MOTION SCHEDULING NOTICE as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2020 before Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin Jr. will be taken on submit. No oral argument will be held. (bjw, )
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2020 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin Jr. Response to Motion due by 3/10/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/16/2020. filed by Paul Czajka. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas K. Murphy, Esq., #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Certificate of Service) (Murphy, Thomas)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter from Peter Schuyler advising the Court he will remain attorney of record for the Plaintiff and will be apply for admission. (pjh)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 2/24/2020 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending a decisions on the dispositive motions. (tab)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MOTION SCHEDULING NOTICE as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Response to Motions due by 3/10/2020. Reply to Response to Motions due by 3/16/2020. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2020 ON SUBMIT before Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin Jr. (bjw, )
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Beaury, Ronald Moore II, Town of Germantown re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Jelinek, Loraine)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2020 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin Jr. Response to Motion due by 3/10/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/16/2020. filed by Robert Beaury, Ronald Moore II, Town of Germantown. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Attorney Loraine C. Jelinek, #2 Exhibit(s) (A) June 1 2018 LT Petition and Order, #3 Exhibit(s) (B) June 1 2018 Petition and Aff by Town, #4 Exhibit(s) (C) Germantown Local Law 2, #5 Exhibit(s) (D) Aug. 7 2018 Special Meeting minutes, #6 Exhibit(s) (E) public referendum notice, #7 Exhibit(s) (F) Pl's Aug. 25 2018 NOC, #8 Memorandum of Law) (Jelinek, Loraine)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Estate of Harry Corbitt re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Earline Corbitt (Rubin, Daniel)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Earline Corbitt filed by Estate of Harry Corbitt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit) (Rubin, Daniel)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Loraine Clare Jelinek on behalf of Robert Beaury, Ronald Moore II, Town of Germantown (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(Jelinek, Loraine)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Peter Schuyler, Email address is pschuyler@kitsonschuyler.com. Phone number is 914-862-0999. Admissions due by 2/7/2020. {Copy served upon attorney by regular mail}. (kmp)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Answer due date set for Robert Beaury answer due 1/30/2020; Ronald Moore II answer due 1/30/2020; and Town of Germantown answer due 1/30/2020. (kmp)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In Person Rule 16 Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/18/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Town of Germantown, Ronald Moore II, and Robert Beaury. (kmp)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Columbia County Supreme Court, case number 14576-79 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5008115) filed by Town of Germantown, Ronald Moore II, Robert Beaury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dubois v. Beaury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Beaury
Represented By: Gregg T. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Harry Corbitt
Represented By: Daniel Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Moore II
Represented By: Gregg T. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Germantown
Represented By: Gregg T. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Czajka
Represented By: Thomas K. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Dubois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?