G.M. v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Plaintiff: G. M.
Defendant: Governor Clinton Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America and Boy Scouts of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00174
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 Court has reviewed docket. The 5/5/2020 telephone Rule 16 Initial Conference and associated deadlines are adjourned at this time without new date. Defendant counsel to file status report on the Bankruptcy by 5/26/2020. SO ORDERED Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/9/2020. (sg )
March 31, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Boy Scouts of America, Governor Clinton Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America NOTICE OF ENTRY OF CONSENT ORDER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105(a) AND 362 GRANTING THE BSAS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Consent Order)(Beckwith, Mathew)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER : The Non-Debtor Defendants' time to submit an answer or other responsive pleading to the Underlying Complaint pending in this Court is extended for a period of seven (7) days. following the hearing on the PI Motion (currently scheduled for March 24, 2020) and entry of an order by the Delaware Bankruptcy Court with respect to the PI Motion (the "Del. Bankr. Ct. PI Order"). Upon entry of the Del. Bankr. Ct. PI Order, the Non-Debtor Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Underlying Complaint in this Court will be extended until August 17, 2020 (180 days from the commencement of the BSA's chapter 11 case), or such date as may be otherwise ordered or extended by order of the Delaware Bankruptcy Court. The Non-Debtor Defendants shall promptly notify this Court of the entry of the Del. Bankr. Ct. PI Order and any modification or extension thereof. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over any matter or dispute arising from or relating to the implementation, interpretation, or enforcement of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/9/2020. (sal)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #6 the Letter-Motion of Defendants Twin River Council, Inc., and Governor Clinton Council, Inc., for the reasons stated therein. Although the Court sees some merit in Plaintiff's opposition (Dkt. No. #8 ), after carefully considering the matter the Court finds that that the disadvantage to Plaintiff is outweighed by the necessity to preserve both the resources of the Court and the integrity of the Debtor Boy Scouts of America's estate. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/9/2020. (sal )
March 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Boy Scouts of America, Governor Clinton Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America NOTICE OF (I) COMMENCEMENT OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND FILING OF MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY THE BSA, (II) MEETING TO CONSIDER THE FORMATION OF AN OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF CREDITORS AND (III) FILING OF MOTION BY THE BSA DEBTORS TO FIX VENUE FOR CLAIMS RELATED TO THE BANKRUPTCY UNDER 28 U.S.C. 157(b)(5) AND 1334(b) (Beckwith, Mathew)
March 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew William Beckwith on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Governor Clinton Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America (Beckwith, Mathew)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Letter Motion from Phyliss A. Hafner, Esq. for Boy Scouts of America, Governor Clinton Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America requesting Extension of Time to File Answer submitted to Judge Hon Glenn T. Suddaby filed by G. M.. (Friedman, Joshua)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff until the end of Monday, March 2, 2020, by which to respond, by letter-brief, to the Non-Debtor Defendants' Letter-Motion of 02/26/2020 (Dkt. No. #6 ). SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 2/27/2020. (sal )
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 Letter Motion from Phyliss A. Hafner, Esq. for Boy Scouts of America, Governor Clinton Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America requesting Extension of Time to File Answer submitted to Judge Hon. Glenn T. Suddaby . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment)(Hafner, Phyliss)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER directing Defendants to promptly redact Plaintiff's name, and replace that name with Plaintiff's initials, in the Notice of Removal and documents attached thereto (Dkt. No. #1 ), and Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. No. #2 ), pursuant to General Order #22, and to email those redacted documents directly to the undersigned's Courtroom Deputy at shelly_muller@nynd.uscourts.gov. Moreover, the Clerk of the Court is directed to replace Plaintiff's name on the docket sheet with Plaintiff's initials, and to restrict public access to the Notice of Removal and documents attached thereto (Dkt. No. #1 ), and Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. No. #2 ), so that those documents may be viewed only by case participants, until such time as those documents have been replaced on the docket with redacted copies. Once the above-described documents have been replaced on the docket with redacted copies, the Clerk may unrestrict access to those documents. Finally, Defendant is directed to redact Plaintiff's name, and replace that name with Plaintiff's initials, in all documents hereafter filed by Defendants in this Court through CM/ECF. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 2/21/2020. (sal)
February 21, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Boy Scouts of America answer due 2/26/2020; Governor Clinton Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America answer due 2/26/2020; Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America answer due 2/26/2020. (mgh)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/5/2020 11:30 AM in before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/28/2020.All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the Court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618 (a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating conference calls to the Court. For cases involving pro se parties, the Court will initiate the call for the Rule 16 Conference. Pro se parties are instructed to provide the Court with a telephone number where they may be reached for a conference call. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Boy Scouts of America; Twin River Council BSA; Governor Clinton Council BOA;; Attorney Michael J. Mazurczak; Mathew w. Beckwith, Email address is maz@melicklaw.com; mbeckwith@melicklaw.com. Phone number is (212) 541-7236. Admissions due by 3/5/2020. (mgh)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by G. M. (Attachments: #1 State Court Stipulation)(mgh)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rensselaer County Supreme Court, case number EF2019-264964 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5033273) filed by Boy Scouts of America, Governor Clinton Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A- State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service for Notice of Removal)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G.M. v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Clinton Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Phyliss A. Hafner
Represented By: Mathew William Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Phyliss A. Hafner
Represented By: Mathew William Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Phyliss A. Hafner
Represented By: Mathew William Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. M.
Represented By: Joshua R. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?