Mahmood v. United States Government
Plaintiff: Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood
Defendant: United States Government
Case Number: 1:2020cv00207
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Mail Service Suspended) re: #8 Order on Report and Recommendations and #9 Judgment sent to Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. Address sent to 9-4-86/89, Flat #201, Khan Tower, Salarjung Colony, Hyderabad, Telangana, 500 008, India (dpk)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 JUDGMENT in favor of United States Government against Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. (Copy served via regular and registered mail upon plaintiff) (Attachments: #1 Appeal Notice) (ban) Modified on 4/9/2020 (ban).
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #7 Report and Recommendations: The Court hereby ORDERS that Magistrate Judge Stewart's Report-Recommendation and Order (Dkt. No. 7) is ADOPTED; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in Defendant's favor and close this case; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiff in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 4/9/20. (Copy served via regular and registered mail upon plaintiff)(ban) Modified on 4/9/2020 (ban).
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT-RECOMMENDATION and ORDER re #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and #5 Pro Se MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. It is hereby RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's #1 Complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Obtain an ECF Login and Password is DENIED. (Objections to R&R due by 4/3/2020, Case Review Deadline 4/7/2020) Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/17/2020. (Copy served via regular mail and certified) (dpk)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/17/2020. (Copy served via regular and certified mail) (dpk)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (dpk)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (dpk)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (dpk)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to the Attorney General of the United States, #2 Proposed Summons as to U.S. Attorney's Office, #3 USM 285 forms) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (dpk)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Government filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - G, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahmood v. United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?