Rhodes et al v. Phoenix Arms
Plaintiff: Edward R. Rhodes and Jean Ann Rhodes
Defendant: Phoenix Arms
Case Number: 1:2020cv00267
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 6-8 days (Jury Trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 7/10/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 7/10/2020. Discovery due by 3/10/2021. Motions to be filed by 5/10/2021. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 9/25/2020. Status Report due by 11/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/24/2020. (tab)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 5/22/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 9/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/24/2020. (tab)
April 24, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/24/2020 by telephone. Appearances by Caitlin Robin, Esq. for plaintiff; Christopher Renzulli, Esq. and Anthony Odorisi, Esq. for Defendant. Pretrial deadlines are established and a scheduling Order to be issued. (tab)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Phoenix Arms. (Renzulli, Christopher)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin Robin on behalf of Edward R. Rhodes, Jean Ann Rhodes (Robin, Caitlin)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Odorisi on behalf of Phoenix Arms (Odorisi, Anthony)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Phoenix Arms.(Renzulli, Christopher)
March 11, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re Set/Reset Answer Deadline. Clerk initially set the incorrect answer deadline. Correct answer deadline of 3/17/2020 has been entered. (dpk)
March 11, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Phoenix Arms answer due 3/17/2020. (dpk)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Phoenix Arms. Attorney Anthony J. Odorisi, Esq. admission due by 3/24/2020. (dpk)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Edward R. Rhodes and Jean Ann Rhodes; Attorney Caitlin Robin, Esq. admission due by 3/24/2020. (dpk)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/24/2020 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/17/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 State Court Records filed by Phoenix Arms. (dpk)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Schoharie, case number 2020-34 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 5056203) filed by Phoenix Arms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Record), #2 Exhibit B (Declaration of Christopher Renzulli), #3 Exhibit C (Declaration of Anthony J. Odorisi), #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes et al v. Phoenix Arms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward R. Rhodes
Represented By: Caitlin Robin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Ann Rhodes
Represented By: Caitlin Robin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Arms
Represented By: Christopher Renzulli
Represented By: Anthony Odorisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?