UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Eleven United States Postal Service Money Orders totaling $11,000 et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Eleven United States Postal Service Money Orders totaling $11,000 and $2,300 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 1:2020cv00343
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 31:5317
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE by Publication of Notice of Forfeiture for 30 consecutive days; Last publication date May 8, 2020; in government website: www.forfeiture.gov; last date to file a claim pursuant to publication is June 9, 2020 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Katz, Adam)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN of USM Returned Unexecuted as to Karol Peters 92 Livingston Ave, Albany, NY 12210 re Forfeiture-Service (sfp, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM Returned Executed on 4/16/20 (sfp, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN of USM Returned Executed on 5/7/20 re Forfeiture-Arrest as to 20-FBI-003103 and 20-FBI-003031. (sfp, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN of USM Returned Executed on 4/21/20 re Forfeiture of service of complaint, warrant of arrest, and third party packet on Karol Peters (sfp, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN of USM Returned Executed on 4/22/20 re Forfeiture of service of complaint, warrant of arrest, and third party packet on Desmond Dyas (sfp, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (pjh, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $2,300 in U.S. Currency and Eleven United States Postal Service Money Orders totaling $11,000 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Eleven United States Postal Service Money Orders totaling $11,000 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleven United States Postal Service Money Orders totaling $11,000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,300 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Adam J. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?