Militinska-Lake v. Kirnon et al
Plaintiff: Olena Militinska-Lake
Defendant: Elatisha Kirnon, John Scherer, Thomas Congdon, Christine F. Balleau, Timothy Canty, Doris Stout, Department of Public Services, Government of New York State, New York State Office of Comptroller: Division of Legal Services and Public Service Commission (PSC)
Case Number: 1:2020cv00443
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting 8 Letter motion requesting an extension of time to serve summons. In accordance with the F.R.C.P., Rule 4(m), a summons must be served within 90 days of issuance. The Court grants an extension but directs plaintiff to file a status report regarding service, on or before June 30, 2020. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 5/14/2020. (Copy served via regular mail on 5/14/2020)(tab)
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Public Service Commission (PSC). (sfp, )
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER temporarily granting #2 Motion to restrict case documents and allowing documents to be filed as restricted, pending appearances by defendants and an opportunity for defendants to respond. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 5/5/2020. (tab)(Copy sent to Plaintiff via regular mail on 5/5/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/16/2020 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/9/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Christine F. Balleau, Timothy Canty, Thomas Congdon, Department of Public Services, Elatisha Kirnon, John Scherer, Doris Stout. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Doris Stout, #2 Summons Issued as to John Scherer, #3 Summons Issued as to Timothy Canty, #4 Summons Issued as to Christine F. Balleau, #5 Summons Issued as to Thomas Congdon, #6 Summons Issued as to Public Service Commission)(mgh) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/20/2020) (mgh, ).
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained to Olena Militinska-Lake at time complaint was filed. (mgh)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION/Application to Seal Case filed by Olena Militinska-Lake. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (mgh)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christine F. Balleau, Timothy Canty, Thomas Congdon, Department of Public Services, Elatisha Kirnon, John Scherer, Doris Stout (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALB011739) filed by Olena Militinska-Lake. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Militinska-Lake v. Kirnon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elatisha Kirnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Scherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Congdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine F. Balleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Canty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government of New York State, New York State Office of Comptroller: Division of Legal Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Service Commission (PSC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olena Militinska-Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?