National Retail Properties, LP v. Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.
Plaintiff: National Retail Properties, LP
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00585
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Retail Properties, LP re #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Morgen, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by National Retail Properties, LP (Morgen, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by National Retail Properties, LP. (Morgen, David)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: According to the docket sheet, the time for defendant to respond to Plaintiff's complaint has expired. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to either file a request for clerk's entry of default or a status report on or before 7/22/2020. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 7/15/2020. (sal )
June 12, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. answer due 6/24/2020. (khr)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and General Filing Order #25 served on Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. on 06/03/2020, filed by National Retail Properties, LP. (Morgen, David)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/28/2020 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/21/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. (khr)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND as gainst Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5129193) filed by National Retail Properties, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Retail Properties, LP v. Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Retail Properties, LP
Represented By: David Morgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?