Covington Specialty Insurance Company v. Potter et al
Plaintiff: Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Antoinette Potter, Jeremy T. Uhll, Francis Potter, Indian Lookout Country Club, Inc., Barbara Wallach, Kathy M. Snyder, Harley Rendezous Classic, Inc. and Timothy M. Rote
Case Number: 1:2020cv00613
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Covington Specialty Insurance Company re #26 Answer to Counterclaim, (Suben, Eric)
July 31, 2020 Filing 26 Plaintiff, Covington Specialty Insurance Company's, Answer to Counterclaims of Defendants Rote and Wallach ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiff's Answer to Counterclaims by Covington Specialty Insurance Company.(Suben, Eric)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Letter Request for withdrawal of Vito John Marzano as attorney of record for Plaintiff Covington Specialty Insurance Company. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 7/31/2020. (sal )
July 30, 2020 Filing 24 Letter Motion from Vito John Marzano for Covington Specialty Insurance Company, Covington Specialty Insurance Company requesting Withdrawal of Attorney submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby . (Marzano, Vito)
July 23, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Harley Rendezvous Classic, Inc. answer due 7/21/2020; Indian Lookout Country Club, Inc. answer due 7/21/2020; Antoinette Potter answer due 7/21/2020; Francis Potter answer due 7/22/2020; Kathy M. Snyder answer due 7/28/2020; Jeremy T. Uhll answer due 7/28/2020. (khr)
July 23, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint and Court Filing Order served on Barbara Wallach, Personal Service on 6/29/2020, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Suben, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint and Court Filing Order served on Jeremy Uhll, Personal Service on 7/07/2020, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Suben, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint and Court Filing Order served on Kathy Snyder, Personal Service on 7/07/2020, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Suben, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint and Court Filing Order served on Timothy Rote via Girlfriend Barbara Wallach on 6/29/2020, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Suben, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint and Court Filing Order served on Timothy Rote via Mailing on 7/01/2020, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Suben, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint and Court Filing Order served on Francis Potter d/b/a Indian Lookout Country Club via Co-Occupant Antoinette Potter on 6/30/2020, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Suben, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint and Court Filing Order served on Francis Potter d/b/a Indian Lookout Country Club via mailing on 7/01/2020, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Suben, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint and Court Filing Order served on Francis Potter Personal via Co-Occupant Antoinette Potter on 6/30/2020, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Suben, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint and Court Filing Order served on Francis Potter on 7/01/2020, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Suben, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint and Court Filing Order served on Antoinette Potter d/b/a Indian Lookout Country Club on 6/30/2020, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Suben, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint and Court Filing Order served on Antoinette Potter on 6/30/2020, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Suben, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint and Court Filing Order served on Indian Lookout Country Club on 6/30/2020, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Suben, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint and Court Filing Order served on Harley Rendezvous on 6/30/2020, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Suben, Eric)
July 17, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #10 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim. Added the attachment that was not filed. (khr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Covington Specialty Insurance Company by Barbara Wallach, Timothy M. Rote.(Abdella, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 Attachment - Summons & Complaint) (khr, ).
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Covington Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent RSUI Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Alleghany Corp. for Covington Specialty Insurance Company.. (Rolle, Lisa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric David Suben on behalf of Covington Specialty Insurance Company (Suben, Eric)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Antoinette Potter, Francis Potter. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sfp, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Covington Specialty Insurance Company is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (Rolle, Lisa)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Covington Specialty Insurance Company is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (Rolle, Lisa)
June 9, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #1 Complaint. Just to correct the misspelling of named defendant,Harley Rendezvous Classic, Inc in the caption only. (khr)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Vito John Marzano on behalf of Covington Specialty Insurance Company (Marzano, Vito)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/24/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Harley Rendezvous Classic, Inc., Indian Lookout Country Club, Inc., Antoinette Potter, Francis Potter, Timothy M. Rote, Kathy M. Snyder, Jeremy T. Uhll, Barbara Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(sfp, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Harley Rendezous Classic, Inc., Indian Lookout Country Club, Inc., Antoinette Potter, Francis Potter, Timothy M. Rote, Kathy M. Snyder, Jeremy T. Uhll, Barbara Wallach (Filing fee $400 receipt number 5132959) filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covington Specialty Insurance Company v. Potter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa M. Rolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy T. Uhll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Lookout Country Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy M. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley Rendezous Classic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M. Rote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?