Richard v. Glens Falls National Bank et al
Plaintiff: Daphne Richard
Defendant: Glens Falls National Bank and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 1:2020cv00734
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1693
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Glens Falls National Bank submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes. (Sosnicki, Lukas)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lukas Sosnicki on behalf of Glens Falls National Bank (Sosnicki, Lukas)
August 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Taras Kick on behalf of Daphne Richard (Kick, Taras)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint & Filing Order served on Glens Falls National Bank on 8/10/2020, filed by Daphne Richard. (Cherundolo, John)
August 20, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Glens Falls National Bank answer due 8/31/2020. (hmr)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Taras P. Kick is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 7/13/2020. (mab)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Taras Kick, Esq. Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5169415. filed by Daphne Richard. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Oath of Admission, #3 E-Filing Registration Form, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Declaration of Sponsor, #6 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Cherundolo, John)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Taras Kick, The Kick Law Firm, APC, 815 Moraga Drive, Los Angeles, CA 90049, Email address is Taras@kicklawfirm.com. Phone number is 310-395-2988. Admissions due by 7/16/2020. (khr)(Emailed copy of this letter to attorney on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/1/2020 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/24/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Glens Falls National Bank. (khr)
July 2, 2020 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named Does 1-100 in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against those defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleadings to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 15 and summonses will be issued at that time. (khr)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Glens Falls National Bank (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5160533) filed by Daphne Richard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard v. Glens Falls National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glens Falls National Bank
Represented By: Lukas Sosnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphne Richard
Represented By: Kevin P. Roddy
Represented By: J. Patrick Lannon
Represented By: John C. Cherundolo
Represented By: Taras Kick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?