State of New York v. The U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Plaintiff: State of New York
Defendant: The U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 1:2020cv00742
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for The U.S. Environmental Protection Agency answer due 9/25/2020. (hmr)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on The U.S. Environmental Protection Agency on July 27, 2020, filed by State of New York. (McGrath, Brendan)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to The U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons for U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons for U.S. Attorney General)(see)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): State of New York is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons to US Attorney Civil Process Clerk, #2 Proposed Summons to US Attorney General)(McGrath, Brendan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/23/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against The U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5161467) filed by State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FOIL Request, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )
July 2, 2020 Notice re: Compliance with General Order #12: Pursuant to General Order #12, counsel is required to file the Notice of Related Case form as a separate document. Refer to the Court's website: www.nynd.uscourts.gov for further instructions. Counsel may access the fillable form using the following link: www.nynd.uscourts.gov/content/general-order-12 (pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New York v. The U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Michael J. Myers
Represented By: Brendan S. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?