Juul Labs, Inc. v. Vapers&Papers, LLC
Plaintiff: Juul Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Vapers&Papers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00774
Filed: July 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
2 Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P.B. Johnson on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Johnson, Kevin)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kevin P.B. Johnson is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 8/27/2020. (mab)
August 25, 2020 Filing 23 Supplemental Admission documents re: #15 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,,. (Weisburst, Sanford)
August 6, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Holmes on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Holmes, Andrew)
August 6, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Olga Slobodyanyuk on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Slobodyanyuk, Olga)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Olga Slobodyanyuk is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 8/4/2020. (mab)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Andrew M. Holmes is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 8/4/2020. (mab)
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 Supplemental Admission documents re: #16 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,,. (Weisburst, Sanford)
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 Supplemental Admission documents re: #14 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,,. (Weisburst, Sanford)
July 23, 2020 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #14 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew M. Holmes, #15 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin P.B. Johnson, and #16 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Olga Slobodyanyuk. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicants MUST provide the following required documents: a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Olga Slobodyanyuk Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5181760. filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 of Olga Slobodyanyuk in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, #2 of Sponsor in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #5 Certificate of Good Standing of Olga Slobodyanyuk for the State Bar of California, #6 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Weisburst, Sanford)
July 22, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin P.B Johnson Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5181737. filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin P.B Johnson in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration of Sponsor in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #5 Certificate of Good Standing of Kevin P.B Johnson for the State Bar of California, #6 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Weisburst, Sanford)
July 22, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew M. Holmes Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5181708. filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Holmes in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration of Sponsor in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #5 Certificate of Good Standing of Andrew Holmes for the State Bar of California, #6 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Weisburst, Sanford)
July 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria F. Maroulis on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc. (Maroulis, Victoria)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice, General Order #25 and Case Assignment Form served on Vapers&Papers, LLC on July 15, 2020, filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Weisburst, Sanford)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Conference: The Initial Conference has been reset for 10/14/2020 @ 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/7/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (tab)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/21/2020. (tab)
July 21, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Vapers&Papers, LLC answer due 8/5/2020. (see)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Juul Labs, Inc.; Attorney Olga Slobodyanyuk, Email address is olgaslobodyanyuk@quinnemanuel.com. Phone number is (650) 801-5000. Admissions due by 7/27/2020. {Emailed to attorney on 7/13/2020}(see)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Juul Labs, Inc.; Attorney Andrew M. Holmes, Email address is drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com. Phone number is (650) 801-5000. Admissions due by 7/27/2020. {Emailed to attorney on 7/13/2020}(see)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Juul Labs, Inc.; Attorney Victoria F. Maroulis, Email address is victoriamaroulis@quinnemanuel.com. Phone number is (650) 801-5000. Admissions due by 7/27/2020. {Emailed to attorney on 7/13/2020} (see)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Juul Labs, Inc.; Attorney Kevin P.B. Johnson, Email address is kevinjohnson@quinnemanuel.com. Phone number is (650) 801-5000. Admissions due by 7/27/2020. {Letter emailed to attorney on 7/13/2020}(see)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/6/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Vapers&Papers, LLC. (see)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 842,536; 858,870; 858,869; and 858,868. (see)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Juul Labs, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Juul Labs, Inc. (see)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Vapers&Papers, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5169731) filed by Juul Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juul Labs, Inc. v. Vapers&Papers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vapers&Papers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Sanford I. Weisburst
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Victoria F. Maroulis
Represented By: Andrew Holmes
Represented By: Olga Slobodyanyuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?