The Phoenix Insurance Company v. Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Defendant: Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00823
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Protective Order (approved). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 9/2/2020. (tab)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Protective Order /Proposed Protective Order Stipulated by Parties filed by Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc.. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Freedenberg, John)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5 Days (Jury Trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2020. Discovery due by 10/1/2021. Motions to be filed by 11/15/2021. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 12/4/2020. Status Report due by 6/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/27/2020. (tab)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 9/24/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 12/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/27/2020. (tab)
August 21, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/21/2020 by telephone. Appearances by Melissa Sullivan, Esq. for Plaintiff Phoenix Insurance Co. Murray Brower, Esq. for Plaintiff Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co. and from 20-CV-826 related case; John P. Freedenberg, Esq. for Defendant Crane Merchandising System. Pretrial deadlines are established in both 20-CV-823 and 20-CV-826. Scheduling Orders will be issued. Mandatory Mediation is set. (tab)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Proposed) by Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc.. (Freedenberg, John)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 COURT NOTICE of dial-in instructions for Chambers Teleconference: This case is scheduled for it's Initial Conference on 8/21/2020 @ 9:00 AM. This Court conference will be conducted telephonically and the parties are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter Access code 9772719#, and use Security code 1234# to join the call. (tab)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc..(Freedenberg, John)
July 23, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc. answer due 7/29/2020. (khr)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/21/2020 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/14/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc. (khr)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Albany, case number 904318-20 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5181123) filed by Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Phoenix Insurance Company v. Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Freedenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?