Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company v. Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00826
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
2 Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Protective Order (approved). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 9/2/2020. (tab)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Protective Order /Proposed Protective Order Stipulated by Parties filed by Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc.. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Freedenberg, John)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5 Days (Jury Trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2020. Discovery due by 10/1/2021. Motions to be filed by 11/15/2021. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 12/4/2020. Status Report due by 6/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/27/2020. (tab)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 9/24/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 12/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/27/2020. (tab)
August 21, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/21/2020 by telephone. Appearances by Murray Brower, Esq. for Plaintiff Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co. and Melissa Sullivan, Esq. for Plaintiff Phoenix Insurance Co. and from 20-CV-823 related case; John P. Freedenberg, Esq. for Defendant Crane Merchandising System. Pretrial deadlines are established in both 20-CV-823 and 20-CV-826. Scheduling Orders will be issued. Mandatory Mediation is set. (tab)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 COURT NOTICE of Change in Conference date/time: The Initial Conference has been rescheduled and will now take place on Friday, August 21, 2020 @ 9:00 AM. This Court conference will be conducted telephonically and the parties are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter Access code 9772719#, and use Security code 1234# to join the call.
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE: Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. Judge David N. Hurd no longer assigned to the case. (bjw, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Application finding that this case and the previously filed civil action, The Phoenix Insurance Company v Crane Merchandising Systems 1:20-cv-823, are related and should be assigned to the same district judge. Therefore, in accordance with General Order 12(G)(6), the Clerk is directed to reassign this case to the undersigned, who is the presiding judge in the earlier assigned case, 5:20-cv-823..IT IS SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 8/19/2020. (bjw, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Proposed) by Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc.. (Freedenberg, John)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case by Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc. submitted to Judge Hurd . Objections due by 8/5/2020 (Freedenberg, John)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc..(Freedenberg, John)
July 24, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc. answer due 7/30/2020. (jel, )
July 24, 2020 Notice re: Compliance with General Order #12: Pursuant to General Order #12, counsel is required to file the Notice of Related Case form as a separate document. Refer to the Court's website: www.nynd.uscourts.gov for further instructions. Counsel may access the fillable form using the following link: www.nynd.uscourts.gov/content/general-order-12 (jel, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/17/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jel, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS AND STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (jel, ) Modified on 7/24/2020 (jel, ).
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court State of New York, County of Albany, case number 04096-20 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5182474) filed by Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company v. Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Merchandising Systems, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Freedenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Murry S. Brower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?