United States of America v. Lagan
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Thomas K. Lagan
Case Number: 1:2020cv00856
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:3205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) Returned Executed on 8/14/2020 for service of Writ of Execution on Gina Martinez, Manager of Messenger Center. (jel, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Letter Response/Answer dated August 11, 2020 from Amanda Saykes, Manage Legal Support for Charles Schwab as to writ of execution served. (jel, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #3 Notice (Other), #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, #2 Order (Langan, Mary)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF POST-JUDGMENT EXECUTION TO HAVE EXEMPTIONS DESIGNATED, AND REQUEST FOR HEARING AND INSTRUCTIONS TO CRIMINAL DEFENDANT. (khr)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Writ of Execution, filed by United States of America (Writ of Execution Issued). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/7/2020. (tab)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Execution filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Writ of Execution, #2 Instructions to Criminal Defendant, Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Execution to have Exemptions designated, and Request for Hearing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas K. Lagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary E. Langan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?