Gray et al v. Capstone Financial et al
Plaintiff: Michele Gray and Cheetah Foods LLC
Defendant: Tyler Stone and Capstone Financial
Case Number: 1:2020cv00896
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 3751
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT-RECOMMENDATION & ORDER - ORDERED, that the motion for leave to proceed IFP (Dkt. No. 2) is GRANTED as to plaintiff Michele Gray only. RECOMMENDED, that the claims asserted by co-plaintiff Cheetah Foods LLC be DISMISSED without prejudice. RECOMMENDED, that plaintiff's Fair Debt Collection Practices Act, Federal Trade Commission Act, Truth In Lending Act, Home Ownership Equity Protection Act, and violation of the automatic bankruptcy stay claims be DISMISSED with prejudice. RECOMMENDED, that the remainder of plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to replead. RECOMMENDED, that, if the District Judge permits plaintiff to amend her complaint, any amended complaint must be filed within thirty (30) days of the District Judge's Order adopting this Report-Recommendation and Order, and that should plaintiff file such amended complaint, the Clerk of the Court return this case to the Magistrate Judge for further review. That the Clerk serve this Report-Recommendation and Order on plaintiff in accordance with the Local Rules Objections to R&R due by 10/6/2020 Case Review Deadline 10/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Unreported Decisions)(Copy served via regular mail upon plaintiff)(jel, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONTACT INFORMATION FOR PLAINTIFF by Michele Gray (jel, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained to Michele Gray at time complaint was filed. (jel, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michele Gray. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (jel, ) Modified on 8/11/2020 (jel, ).
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capstone Financial, Tyler Stone filed by Michele Gray, Cheetah Foods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2020: #3 Proposed Summons) (jel, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray et al v. Capstone Financial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheetah Foods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capstone Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?