The Fiqh Mosque, Inc. v. Dimitriadis et al
Plaintiff: The Fiqh Mosque, Inc.
Defendant: Don Hogan, Matthew Maloney, Irvin Ackerman, The City of Watervliet, New York and Tina Dimitriadis
Case Number: 1:2020cv00940
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Letter Request to extend the answer deadline until after the Motion to Remand is decided. The Initial Conference that was set for 10/2/2020 @ 9:30am before the undersigned and the associated deadlines, are adjourned and will be reset at the appropriate time. So Ordered. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 9/21/2020. (tab)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 Letter Motion from Jonathan M. Bernstein, Esq. for Irvin Ackerman, Tina Dimitriadis, Don Hogan, Matthew Maloney, The City of Watervliet, New York requesting a 30-day extension to answer filed by The Fiqh Mosque, Inc.. (Zahler, Michael)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 Letter Motion from Jonathan M. Bernstein, Esq. for Irvin Ackerman, Tina Dimitriadis, Don Hogan, Matthew Maloney, The City of Watervliet, New York requesting a 30-day extension to answer . (Bernstein, Jonathan)
September 17, 2020 MOTION RESCHEDULING NOTICE as to #8 MOTION to Remand As this motion is considered dispositive, the motion is returnable before Senior Judge Scullin and the deadlines are reset as follows: Response to Motion due by 11/10/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/16/2020. Motion Hearing reset for 11/27/2020 ON SUBMIT before Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin Jr. (bjw, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2020 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel Response to Motion due by 11/2/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/9/2020. filed by The Fiqh Mosque, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel A. Spitzer in Support of Motion to Remand by Fiqh Mosque, Inc., #2 Exhibit(s) A. Plaintiff's First Amended Verified Petition/Complaint filed 7.31.2020, #3 Exhibit(s) B. Defendant City of Watervliet, NY Notice of Removal, #4 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Remand) (Spitzer, Daniel)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Zahler on behalf of The Fiqh Mosque, Inc. (Zahler, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Spitzer on behalf of The Fiqh Mosque, Inc. (Spitzer, Daniel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement ; Attorney Henry A. Zomerfeld, Email address is hzomerfe@hodgsonruss.com. Phone number is 716-848-1420. Admissions due by 8/31/2020. {Notice served upon attorney via e-mail}(pjh, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/25/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed in Albany County Supreme Court by The Fiqh Mosque, Inc. (pjh, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed in Albany County Supreme Court by The Fiqh Mosque, Inc. (pjh, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION OF REMOVAL from Albany County Supreme Court, case number 904909-20 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5207838) filed by The City of Watervliet, New York. (Attachments: #1 Petition of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - First Amended State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate of Service)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Fiqh Mosque, Inc. v. Dimitriadis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Hogan
Represented By: Jonathan M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Maloney
Represented By: Jonathan M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvin Ackerman
Represented By: Jonathan M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Watervliet, New York
Represented By: William J. Greagan
Represented By: Jonathan M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Dimitriadis
Represented By: Jonathan M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fiqh Mosque, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Wayne Malcomb, II
Represented By: Daniel A. Spitzer
Represented By: Michael D. Zahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?