Maxam et al v. County of Warren, NY et al
Plaintiff: June Maxam and The North Country Gazette
Defendant: County of Warren, NY, Ryan Moore and Donald Lehman
Case Number: 1:2020cv00951
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Letter Request dated 9/1/20 filed by June Maxam, Pro Se and The North Country Gazette, Pro Se requesting to withdraw the action. The case is withdrawn WITHOUT prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to mark the case closed. So Ordered. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 9/3/2020. (Copy served via regular mail on 9/3/2020)(tab)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER REQUEST dated 9/1/20 filed by June Maxam, Pro Se and The North Country Gazette, Pro Se requesting to withdraw the action. Submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel. {With envelope attached} (kmp)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 RECEIPT OF SIGNED PRO SE NOTICE filed by June Maxam, Pro Se. {With envelope attached} (kmp)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE and LOCAL RULES served upon Pro Se via regular mail. (kmp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by June Maxam, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for County of Warren, NY, #2 Proposed Summons for Ryan Moore, #3 Proposed Summons for Donald Lehman) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. (kmp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Warren, NY, Ryan Moore, and Donald Lehman filed by June Maxam, Pro Se and The North Country Gazette, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(kmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxam et al v. County of Warren, NY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Warren, NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Maxam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The North Country Gazette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?