Thrall v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Thrall
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01269
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Action by Jeffrey Thrall (Zuppa, Raymond)
October 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Zuppa, Jr on behalf of Jeffrey Thrall (Zuppa, Raymond)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's #8 Letter Request seeking an extension of time to file a response to the Complaint in this matter. Defendant shall file a response on or before November 23, 2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/21/2020. (mab)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re #4 G.O. 25 Filing Order, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, and Civil Cover Sheet on Attorneys for Plaintiff. (Boyd, J'Naia)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 Letter Motion from J'Naia L. Boyd for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company requesting Extension of Time to answer, move against or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint submitted to Judge Thomas J. McAvoy . (Boyd, J'Naia)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Troisi on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Troisi, Michael)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by J'Naia Boyd on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Boyd, J'Naia)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Jeffrey Thrall; Attorney Raymond J. Zuppa, Esq., Email address is rayzuppa@thezuppafirm.com. Phone number is (516)280-9834. Admissions due by 10/29/2020. (Notice of Admission Requirement emailed to Attorney Zuppa) (mgh)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/13/2021 11:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/6/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (mgh)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Jeffrey Thrall. (mgh)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Saratoga Supreme Court, case number EF20201793 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5278492) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A- State Court Papers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thrall v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael P. Versichelli
Represented By: Frank P. Izzo
Represented By: Michael A Troisi
Represented By: J'Naia Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Thrall
Represented By: Raymond Zuppa, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?