Chrysler v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marion Chrysler
Defendant: Gynecare, Inc., Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Ethicon Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv01271
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/30/2020. (jdp, )
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/30/2020. (jdp, )
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: deeming this case related to Balura et al. v. Ethicon Inc., et al., Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-1372 (LEK/ML) under Section G.2. of General Order 12, because there exists a similarity of facts and legal issues between the two cases that will likely result in a substantial saving of judicial resources. Additionally, actions involving common questions of law or fact pending before a court may be consolidated to avoid unnecessary costs or delay pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). As a result, the Court finds that consolidation is appropriate. Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-1372 (LEK/ML) shall be deemed the "Lead Case" and this case shall be deemed a "Member Case." ALL FUTURE FILINGS MUST BE FILED IN THE LEAD ACTION ONLY, 3:19-CV-1372 (LEK/ML). NO FURTHER SUBMISSIONS ARE TO BE FILED IN THIS ACTION. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/29/2020.(jdp )
October 29, 2020 Docket Annotation- Case 3:19-CV-1372 will be the lead case and all further docketing shall be done in the lead case ONLY. (jdp )
October 28, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: a telephone status conference was held on 10/28/2020. The Court and parties discussed consolidating this case with Balura et al. v. Ethicon Inc., et al., Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-1372 (LEK/ML). Plaintiff and Defendants do not oppose consolidation. Appearances: C. Gomez, Esq., for Plaintiff; and M. Kabbash, Esq., for Defendants. (jdp )
October 28, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by John K. Powers on behalf of Marion Chrysler (Powers, John)
October 27, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lee B. Balefsky Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5294737. filed by Marion Chrysler. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Powers, John)
October 27, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher A. Gomez Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5294329. filed by Marion Chrysler. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Powers, John)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839, enter access code 5177238, and shall be prepared to discuss whether this matter should be consolidated with Balura et al. v. Ethicon Inc., et al., Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-1372 (LEK/ML). SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/26/2020.(jdp )
October 23, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Katz Gerstel on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Gynecare, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gerstel, Diana)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly S. Crawford on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Gynecare, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Crawford, Kelly)
October 23, 2020 Filing 16 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon Inc., Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Gynecare, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Kabbash, Maha)
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Ethicon Inc., Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Gynecare, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Withdrawal of Counsel (Kabbash, Maha)
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Maha M. Kabbash on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Gynecare, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Kabbash, Maha)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 12/9/2020 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/2/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) {Copies sent to Attorney Balefsky by email} (jmb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Ethicon Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued for Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, #2 Summons issued for Gynecare, #3 Summons issued for Johnson & Johnson) {Copies sent to Attorney Balefsky by email} (jmb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendants'; Attorney Scott Richard Hunsaker, Esq., Email address is scott.hunsaker@tuckerellis.com. Phone number is 314-356-2533. Admissions due by 11/3/2020. {Copy sent to Attorney Hunsaker by email} (jmb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Lee B. Balefsky, Esq., Email address is lee.balefsky@klinespecter.com. Phone number is 215-772-0420. Admissions due by 11/3/2020. {Copy sent to Attorney Balefsky by email} (jmb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:12-cv-00668. electronically transferred when case opened
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 motion to change venue. Signed on 8/19/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/15/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to change venue : Stipulation and Joint Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Scott Richard Hunsaker on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hunsaker, Scott) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/15/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Scott Richard Hunsaker on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Scott Richard Hunsaker added to party Ethicon Women's Health and Urology(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Richard Hunsaker added to party Ethicon, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Richard Hunsaker added to party Gynecare, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Richard Hunsaker added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft))(Hunsaker, Scott) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/15/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 MDL CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (MDL No. 2327) from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. Signed on 6/4/2020 by Clerk of Court. (Attachments: #1 Suggestions of Remand) (Ellis, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/15/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. This case has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Greg Kays for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:12-00668-CV-W-DGK. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Jones, Robin) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/15/2020.]
June 14, 2012 Filing 3 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-28, from Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Southern District of West Virginia to be included in MDL No. 2327. Signed on June 13, 2012. Case electronically transferred. (Terry, Bill) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/15/2020.]
June 1, 2012 Filing 2 MDL Notification - Notice of potential tag along case for MDL 2327 with copy of complaint and docket sheet sent to MDL Panel. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet) (Rowland, Bonnie) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/15/2020.]
June 1, 2012 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to both counsel for plaintiff. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 6/25/2012 (Rowland, Bonnie) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/15/2020.]
May 31, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Ethicon, Inc., Gynecare, Inc., Johnson & Johnson filed by Jeffrey M. Kuntz on behalf of Marion Chrysler. Filing fee $350, receipt number 0866-3110043. Service due by 10/1/2012. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chrysler v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Chrysler
Represented By: John K. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gynecare, Inc.
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Women's Health and Urology
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc.
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?