Bodenstab v. The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut
Plaintiff: Mary Bodenstab
Defendant: The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut
Case Number: 1:2020cv01275
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on The Automotive Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut c/o New York State Department of Financial Services on October 21, 2020, filed by Mary Bodenstab. (McDermott, Michael)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5 days (Jury trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2020. Discovery due by 9/30/2021. Motions to be filed by 11/30/2021. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 3/1/2021. Status Report due by 4/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/18/2020. (tab)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 12/16/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 3/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/18/2020. (tab)
November 17, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/17/2020 by telephone. Appearances by Michael McDermott, Esq. for plaintiff; Meg Reid, Esq. for Defendant. Pretrial deadlines are established and a Scheduling Order will be issued. (tab)
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mary Bodenstab. (McDermott, Michael)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Mary Bodenstab. (McDermott, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 COURT NOTICE of dial-in instructions for Chambers Teleconference: This case is scheduled for it's Initial Conference on 11/17/2020 @ 10:30 AM. This Court conference will be conducted by telephone and the parties are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter Access code 9772719#, and use Security code 1234# to join the call. (tab)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut.(Reid, Meg)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/17/2020 10:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/10/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
October 16, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut answer due 10/22/2020. (khr)
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut. (khr)
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Rensselaer, case number EF2020-267136 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5281071) filed by The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodenstab v. The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Bodenstab
Represented By: Michael P. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?