Lynch et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Lynch and Christine G. Lynch
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01324
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's #9 Letter Request seeking an extension of time to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint in this matter. Defendant shall file a response on or before March 5, 2021. In light of this extension, the Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for January 25, 2021 before the undersigned and the deadline for the parties to file a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date and will be rescheduled upon the filing of Defendant's Answer. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/16/2020. (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff by regular mail) (mab)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 Letter Motion from Mary E. Langan for United States of America requesting an extension of time submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Langan, Mary)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond A. Lynch, Christine G. Lynch. United States of America served on 11/3/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for U.S. Attorney General)(see)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Langan on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Langan, Mary)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 PRO SE NOTICE RETURNED EXECUTED as to Christine G. Lynch, Pro Se.(kmc)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE mailed to Christine G. Lynch on 10/26/2020. (see)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained to Raymond A. Lynch at time complaint was filed. {Copies of all documents returned to to pltf at the Albany Clerk's Office.} (see)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/25/2021 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/19/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons for U.S. Attorney General)(see)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALB011884) filed by Raymond A. Lynch and Christine G. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-19, medical records, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine G. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Langan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?