Layne et al v. The Town of Colonie
Plaintiff: John and Jane Doe "1" through "10", Nicholas Morgan, Nicholas Layne and Nicholas Sidoti
Defendant: The Town of Colonie
Case Number: 1:2020cv01402
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change in Initial Conference: At the request of counsel and approval by the Court, the Initial Conference is reset for 2/18/2021 @ 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/11/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) This Court conference will be conducted by telephone and the parties are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter Access code 9772719#, and use Security code 1234# to join the call.(tab)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Town of Colonie re #5 Answer to Complaint (Redding, Earl)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Town of Colonie.(Redding, Earl)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summs in a Civil Action, Complaint Jury Trial Demand with General Order #25 served on The Town of Colonie on 11/16/2020, filed by John and Jane Doe "1" through "10", Nicholas Layne, Nicholas Morgan, Nicholas Sidoti. (Davenport, Paul)
November 24, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for The Town of Colonie answer due 12/7/2020. (hmr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/4/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Town of Colonie. (hmr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against The Town of Colonie (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5315581) filed by Nicholas Morgan, Nicholas Layne, Nicholas Sidoti, John and Jane Doe "1" through "10". (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Layne et al v. The Town of Colonie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John and Jane Doe "1" through "10"
Represented By: Richard P. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Paul E. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Morgan
Represented By: Richard P. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Paul E. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Layne
Represented By: Richard P. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Paul E. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Sidoti
Represented By: Richard P. Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Paul E. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Colonie
Represented By: Earl T. Redding
Represented By: Benjamin D. Heffley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?