Rounds v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Rounds
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. and Coopersurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01640
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #5. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Georgia for inclusion into MDL-2974 Paragard IUD Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Leigh Martin May, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
January 25, 2021 Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Georgia for inclusion into MDL-2974 Paragard IUD Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Leigh Martin May, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
January 25, 2021 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in Northern District of Georgia as case 1:21-cv-00382, filed 01/25/2021. (plp)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Rounds. The Cooper Companies, Inc. served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Kassan, Randi)
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Rounds. Teva Women's Health, LLC served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Kassan, Randi)
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Rounds. Teva Women's Health, Inc. served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Kassan, Randi)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Rounds. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Kassan, Randi)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Rounds. Coopersurgical, Inc. served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Kassan, Randi)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/5/2021 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/29/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to the Cooper Companies, Inc., #2 Summons Issued as to Teva Women's Health, Inc., #3 Summons Issued as to Teva Women's Health, LLC, #4 Summons Issued as to Coopersurgical, Inc.)(pjh, )
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC and The Cooper Companies, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5367194) filed by Jessica Rounds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rounds v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Rounds
Represented By: Randi A. Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?