Onteora Central School District v. CNA Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Onteora Central School District
Defendant: Pacific Employers Insurance Company, CNA Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford and Continental Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00027
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: The Court held a Rule 16 Initial Conference with the parties on February 25, 2021. The Court, sua sponte, exempts this matter from the Mandatory Mediation Program. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/1/2021. (mab)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5 Days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 7/28/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 7/28/2021. Discovery due by 1/28/2022. Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure Deadline is 11/1/2021. Defendants' Expert Disclosure Deadline is 12/14/2021. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 12/29/2021. Motions to be filed by 3/28/2022. Status Report due by 6/4/2021. This case has been exempt from the Court's Mandatory Mediation Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/1/2021. (mab)
February 25, 2021 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart: Rule 16 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/25/2021. Appearances: Michael Fishman, Esq. for Plaintiff; Marian Hertz, Esq., Edward Tafe, Esq. and Marianne May, Esq. for Defendants. The Court hears from counsel as to their positions in this matter and as to how they intend to proceed. Mandatory Disclosures have been exchanged. The Court discusses the Mandatory Mediation Program. Based upon the discussions held with counsel, the matter is OPTED OUT of the Court's Mandatory Mediation Program. If settlement becomes a possibility as the case progresses, counsel are to advise the Court. Deadlines set. Scheduling Order to be issued. (TIME: 9:32AM-9:47AM). (mab)
February 18, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Tafe on behalf of Continental Casualty Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford (Tafe, Edward)
February 18, 2021 Filing 19 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Onteora Central School District. (Fishman, Michael)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 Initial Conference in this matter is RESCHEDULED as to TIME ONLY and is now set for February 25, 2021 at 9:30 AM before the undersigned and will be conducted by TELEPHONE. The Court will issue a separate notice setting forth the instructions to connect to the conference call. Counsel are directed to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures on or before February 18, 2021. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/17/2021. (mab)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Edward J. Tafe is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Defendants. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/17/2021. (mab)
February 16, 2021 Filing 16 Supplemental Admission documents re: #13 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing #2)(Hertz, Marian)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Service)(May, Marianne)
February 8, 2021 Filing 14 Supplemental Admission documents re: #13 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,,. (Hertz, Marian)
February 8, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward J. Tafe CCC-NFICH Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5411918. filed by CNA Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Attachments: #1 CCC-NFICH Petition for Admission, #2 CCC-NFICH Certificate of Good Standing, #3 CCC-NFICH Attorney E-Filing Registration, #4 CCC-NFICH Declaration of Sponsor, #5 CCC-NFICH Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Hertz, Marian)
February 8, 2021 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #13 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice, Edward J. Tafe. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Fishman on behalf of Onteora Central School District (Fishman, Michael)
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 Continental Casualty Company & National Fire Insurance of Hartford ANSWER to Complaint by CNA Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Attachments: #1 CCC & NFICH RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES, #2 CCC & NFICH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Hertz, Marian)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Pacific Employers Insurance Company's #9 Letter Request seeking an extension of time to file a response to the Complaint in this matter. Defendant shall file a response on or before February 16, 2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/14/2021. (mab)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 Supplemental Letter Motion from Marianne May for Pacific Employers Insurance Company requesting 30-day extension of time to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint submitted to Judge D'Agostino and Stewart . (May, Marianne)
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 Letter Motion from Marianne May for Pacific Employers Insurance Company requesting 30-day extension of time to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint submitted to Judge D'Agostino and Stewart . (May, Marianne)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pacific Employers Insurance Company re #6 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (May, Marianne)
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pacific Employers Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Pacific Employers Insurance Company.. (May, Marianne)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (see)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Onteora Central School District; Attorney Michael Fishman, Esq. Admissions due by 1/25/2021. (Notice and copy of General Order #25 mailed to attorney on 1/11/2021.) (dpk)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/25/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/18/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.)(dpk)
January 11, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Pacific Employers Insurance Company answer due 1/15/2021. (dpk)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 State Court Records filed. (dpk)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Ulster, case number EF2020-3100 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5375678) filed by Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Service of Complaint), #3 Exhibit C (Email), #4 Exhibit D (Underlying Complaint), #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onteora Central School District v. CNA Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Employers Insurance Company
Represented By: Marianne G. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Insurance Company
Represented By: Marian S Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Edward J. Tafe
Represented By: Marian S Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Edward J. Tafe
Represented By: Marian S Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onteora Central School District
Represented By: Michael Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?