Moore et al v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Plaintiff: Robyn Moore and Gabrielle Stuve
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00183
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
2 Judge: Frederick J Scullin
3 Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Consolidate Actions. The action 1:21-cv-133 shall be deemed the LEAD CASE. All other actions will be deemed MEMBER CASES. All further filings shall be made in the LEAD CASE: 1:21-cv-133. Defendant shall file an answer w/in 60 days of the filing of a Consolidated Complaint, or by 5/15/2021, whichever is later. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 3/19/2021. (amt)
March 17, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION [and Proposed Order} to Consolidate Actions Under FED.R.CIV.P.42 (a) by Robyn Moore, Gabrielle Stuve submitted to Judge Thomas J. McAvoy. (Feldman, Lori)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER approving #20 Stipulation filed by Beech-Nut Nutrition Company to reset the deadline in which to answer or otherwise respond. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company answer due 5/15/2021. The Initial Conference is reset for Friday, 6/11/2021 @ 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/4/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.). Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/11/2021. (tab)
March 10, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION , to be so-ordered, extending defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint until May 15 by Beech-Nut Nutrition Company submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
March 5, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Livia M. Kiser on behalf of Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (Kiser, Livia)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Livia M. Kiser, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/4/2021. (tab)
March 2, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Livia M. Kiser Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5443136. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form with Oath, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Brittany L. Brown, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 2/26/2021. (tab)
February 26, 2021 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beech-Nut Nutrition Company identifying Corporate Parent Hero Beteiligungen AG, Corporate Parent Hero USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Hero AG, Corporate Parent Schwartau International GmbH, Corporate Parent AOH Nahrungsmittel GmbH & Co. KG for Beech-Nut Nutrition Company.. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
February 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen E. McCarthy on behalf of Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (McCarthy, Kathleen)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for David J. George, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 2/25/2021. (tab)
February 25, 2021 Filing 12 Supplemental Admission documents re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Feldman, Lori)
February 25, 2021 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice OF Brittany L. Brown. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a signed and dated New Attorney E-filing Registration Form; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of David J. George Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5434510. filed by Robyn Moore, Gabrielle Stuve. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Feldman, Lori)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brittany L. Brown Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5434471. filed by Robyn Moore, Gabrielle Stuve. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Feldman, Lori)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy and Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr, and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 2/23/2021. (amt)
February 22, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Beech-Nut Nutrition Company answer due 3/11/2021. (map)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Class Action Complaint, Filing Order, Receipt of Filing Feed and Civil Cover Sheet served on Jane Doe on 02/18/2021, filed by Robyn Moore, Gabrielle Stuve. (Feldman, Lori)
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Janine L. Pollack, Email address is jpollack@calcaterrapollack.com. Phone number is 917-899-1765. Admissions due by 3/3/2021. (khr)(Emailed notice on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Michael Liskow, Email address is mliskow@calcaterrapollack.com. Phone number is 917-899-1765. Admissions due by 3/3/2021. (khr)(Emailed notice on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Brittany L. Brown, Email address is bbrown@4-justice.com. Phone number is 561-232-6002. Admissions due by 3/3/2021. (khr)(Emailed notice on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney David J. George, Email address is dgeorge@4-justice.com. Phone number is 561-232-6002. Admissions due by 3/3/2021. (khr)(Emailed notice on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/19/2021 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/12/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. (khr)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5423023) filed by Robyn Moore, Gabrielle Stuve. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Filing Fee Receipt, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Moore
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Stuve
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Represented By: Livia M. Kiser
Represented By: Kathleen E. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?