Almukthar v. S&A Trading USA INC et al
Plaintiff: Hamza Almukthar
Defendant: S&A Trading USA INC, Bilal A. Shokias and Sahil M. Aziz
Case Number: 1:2021cv00190
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for May 20, 2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on the dispositive motion. (tab)
April 12, 2021 TEXT NOTICE re #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by S&A Trading USA INC., Sahil M. Aziz, and Bilal A. Shokias : Response to motion remains due by 4/30/2021. Reply to motion remains due by 5/7/2021. This motion is taken on submission of the papers and returnable before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. No appearances are required. (sal)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion to Dismiss served on Bart Mayol on 04/09/2021, filed by S&A Trading USA INC. (Smelyansky, Max)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by S&A Trading USA INC, Sahil M. Aziz, and Bilal A. Shokias. Motion returnable before Judge Hon. Glenn T. Suddaby Response to Motion due by 4/30/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affirmation Attorney Affirmation in Support, #2 Affidavit Defendant S and A Affidavit in Support, #3 Exhibit(s) DOS Filing & Lease Agreement, #4 Affidavit Defendant Shokias Affidavit in Support, #5 Affidavit Defendant Aziz Affidavit in Support, #6 Memorandum of Law Memo of Law) (Smelyansky, Max) Modified on 4/12/2021 to include defts. Aziz & Shokias as filers of the motion (sal ).
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Max Smelyansky on behalf of All Defendants (Smelyansky, Max)
March 3, 2021 ***Answer deadline set for Sahil M. Aziz, Bilal A. Shokias and S&A Trading USA INC to 3/18/2021. (jmb)
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Amended Complaint, General Order served on ALL DEFENDANTS on 2-25-2021, filed by Hamza Almukthar. (Mayol, Bart)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Hamza Almukthar.(Mayol, Bart)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/13/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to S&A Trading USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued for Sahil M. Aziz, #2 Summons issued for Bilal A. Shokias) (jmb)
February 19, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: The Clerk contacted Attorney Bart Mayol to determine the proper names of two of the defendants as the #1 Complaint lists them inconsistently in various parts of the pleading. Counsel advised that the parties names are Sahil M. Aziz and Bilal A. Shokias and he stated he will be filing an Amended Complaint that clarifies the party names as soon as possible. (jmb)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: against S&A Trading USA INC, Shokias A. Bilal and Sahil M. Aziz (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5426793) filed by Hamza Almukthar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almukthar v. S&A Trading USA INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&A Trading USA INC
Represented By: Max Smelyansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilal A. Shokias
Represented By: Max Smelyansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sahil M. Aziz
Represented By: Max Smelyansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamza Almukthar
Represented By: Bart Mayol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?