Cantor et al v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Plaintiff: Vito Scarola, Haley Sams, Heather Hyden, Anthony Harrison, Dominick Grossi, Jeremy Cantor, Ashley Allen, Kaitlynn Carson, Neisha Daniels, Emily Baccari, Jillian Geffken, Christina Holland, Heather McCormick, Amber Caudill and Hannah Grandt
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00213
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P Guglielmo on behalf of Ashley Allen, Jeremy Cantor, Dominick Grossi, Anthony Harrison, Heather Hyden, Haley Sams, Vito Scarola (Guglielmo, Joseph)
April 7, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for (1) Summons in a Civil Action; and (2) Amended Class Action Complaint served on Corporation Service Company (Registered Agent) on April 1, 2021, filed by Ashley Allen, Emily Baccari, Jeremy Cantor, Kaitlynn Carson, Amber Caudill, Neisha Daniels, Jillian Geffken, Hannah Grandt, Dominick Grossi, Anthony Harrison, Christina Holland, Heather Hyden, Heather McCormick, Haley Sams, Vito Scarola. (Huot, Innessa)
March 23, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Bloch on behalf of Ashley Allen, Emily Baccari, Jeremy Cantor, Kaitlynn Carson, Amber Caudill, Neisha Daniels, Jillian Geffken, Hannah Grandt, Dominick Grossi, Anthony Harrison, Christina Holland, Heather Hyden, Heather McCormick, Haley Sams, Vito Scarola (Bloch, Steven) (Clerk replaced Main Document 18 with flattened / non-editable version of document on 3/23/2021). Modified on 3/23/2021. (map)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Consolidate Actions. The action 1:21-cv-133 shall be deemed the LEAD CASE. All other actions will be deemed MEMBER CASES. All further filings shall be made in the LEAD CASE: 1:21-cv-133. Defendant shall file an answer w/in 60 days of the filing of a Consolidated Complaint, or by 5/15/2021, whichever is later. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 3/19/2021. (amt)
March 18, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Wise Sloss on behalf of Ashley Allen, Emily Baccari, Jeremy Cantor, Kaitlynn Carson, Amber Caudill, Neisha Daniels, Jillian Geffken, Hannah Grandt, Dominick Grossi, Anthony Harrison, Christina Holland, Heather Hyden, Heather McCormick, Haley Sams, Vito Scarola (Sloss, Ian)
March 16, 2021 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beech-Nut Nutrition Company identifying Corporate Parent Hero Beteiligungen AG, Corporate Parent Hero USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Hero AG, Corporate Parent Schwartau International GmbH, Corporate Parent AOH Nahrungsmittel GmbH & Co. KG for Beech-Nut Nutrition Company.. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen E. McCarthy on behalf of Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (McCarthy, Kathleen)
March 16, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for (1) Summons in a Civil Action; (2) Civil Cover Sheet; (3) Class Action Complaint served on Corporation Service Company (Registered Agent) on 03/10/2021, filed by Ashley Allen, Emily Baccari, Jeremy Cantor, Kaitlynn Carson, Amber Caudill, Neisha Daniels, Jillian Geffken, Hannah Grandt, Dominick Grossi, Anthony Harrison, Christina Holland, Heather Hyden, Heather McCormick, Haley Sams. (Sloss, Ian)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Zachary A. Rynar, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/15/2021. (tab, )
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 Supplemental Admission documents re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Huot, Innessa)
March 15, 2021 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Zachary A. Rynar. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Zachary A. Rynar Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5454577. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Huot, Innessa)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Ian Sloss, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/10/2021. (tab)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Steven Bloch, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/10/2021. (tab)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Beech-Nut Nutrition Company filed by Haley Sams, Ashley Allen, Anthony Harrison, Heather Hyden, Jeremy Cantor, Vito Scarola, Dominick Grossi, Emily Baccari, Neisha Daniels, Heather McCormick, Jillian Geffken, Kaitlynn Carson, Christina Holland, Hannah Grandt, Amber Caudill.(Huot, Innessa)
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ian W. Sloss Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5447129. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Huot, Innessa)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven L. Bloch Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5444529. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Huot, Innessa)
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff's Counsel: Steven L. Bloch, Esq., Ian W. Sloss, Esq., and Zachary Rynar, Esq. Served via email correspondence at email addresses: sbloch@sgtlaw.com, isloss@sgtlaw.com, and zrynar@sgtlaw.com. Admissions due by 3/11/2021. (map)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 In-Person Conference set for 5/24/2021 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/17/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. (map)
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5434838) filed by Haley Sams, Ashley Allen, Anthony Harrison, Heather Hyden, Jeremy Cantor, Vito Scarola, Dominick Grossi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantor et al v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vito Scarola
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Sams
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Hyden
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Harrison
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Grossi
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Cantor
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Allen
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlynn Carson
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neisha Daniels
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Baccari
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Geffken
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Holland
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather McCormick
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Caudill
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Grandt
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Represented By: Kathleen E. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?