Gancarz v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Plaintiff: Kelsey Gacarz and Kelsey Gancarz
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00258
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Consolidate Actions. The action 1:21-cv-133 shall be deemed the LEAD CASE. All other actions will be deemed MEMBER CASES. All further filings shall be made in the LEAD CASE: 1:21-cv-133. Defendant shall file an answer w/in 60 days of the filing of a Consolidated Complaint, or by 5/15/2021, whichever is later. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 3/19/2021. (amt)
March 8, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: Clerk modified the docket text of the #1 Complaint to correct the spelling of the Plaintiff's name. (pjh, )
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/3/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/27/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. (pjh, )
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5447276) filed by Kelsey Gacarz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gancarz v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Gacarz
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Gancarz
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?