Lamoureux v. Trustco Bank
Plaintiff: Robert N. Lamoureux
Defendant: Trustco Bank
Case Number: 1:2021cv00336
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1693
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jeffrey C. Bils is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 4/13/2021. (mab)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Taras Kick is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 4/13/2021. (mab)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 Supplemental Admission documents re: #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Lannon, J. Patrick)
April 8, 2021 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Taras Kick. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: completed Declaration of Sponsor form The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey C. Bils Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5485933. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Declaration of Sponsor, #4 E-file Registration Form, #5 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Lannon, J. Patrick)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Taras Kick Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5485893. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Declaration of Sponsor, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 E-file Registration Form, #5 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Lannon, J. Patrick)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trustco Bank. Trustco Bank waiver sent on 3/31/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Peck, Crystal)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Direct Assignment of case to Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. The cases 1:21-CV-336 (GTS/DJS) and 1:20-CV-1030 (GTS/DJS) are deemed related. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/29/2021. (sal)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Robert N. Lamoureux; Attorney Jeffrey C. Bils, Email address is jeff@kicklawfirm.com. Phone number is (310) 395-2988. Admissions due by 4/8/2021. (jel, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Robert N. Lamoureux; Attorney Tara Kick, Email address is taras@kicklawfirm.com. Phone number is (310) 395-2988. Admissions due by 4/8/2021. (jel, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/25/2021 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/18/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jel, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Trustco Bank. (jel, )
March 25, 2021 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 1:20-cv-1030 (GTS/DJS). (jel, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Trustco Bank, A Federal Savings Bank (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5469347) filed by Robert N. Lamoureux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamoureux v. Trustco Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustco Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert N. Lamoureux
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Kaliel
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Kevin P. Roddy
Represented By: J. Patrick Lannon
Represented By: John C. Cherundolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?