Hill et al v. Norlite, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ed Sokol, Audrey Anna Gallardo, Chelsea Sturtevant, Brittany McNair, Margaret Franklin, Debra Hill, David Olivencia, Margaret Sevinsky, Jennifer Malinowski and Christopher Sevinsky
Defendant: Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC, Norlite, LLC and Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00439
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' status report #19 . Plaintiffs seek to withdraw their motion to remand, and they seek a court conference under N.D.N.Y. Local Rule 7.1(a)(2) to discuss their request for expedited discovery #19 . Plaintiffs' request to withdraw the motion to remand is GRANTED and the motion to remand #13 is hereby withdrawn. Plaintiffs' request for a court conference under N.D.N.Y. Local Rule 7.1(a)(2) is referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart. So Ordered by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 6/4/2021. (nmk)
June 3, 2021 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT pursuant to this Court's Text Order dated May 19, 2021 by Margaret Franklin, Audrey Anna Gallardo, Debra Hill, Jennifer Malinowski, Brittany McNair, David Olivencia, Christopher Sevinsky, Ed Sokol, Chelsea Sturtevant. (Oswald, Phillip)
May 27, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Phillip A. Oswald Effective Date 5/27/2021 Old Address: 25 Walton Street, Saratoga Springs, NY 12866 New Address: 227 Washington Street, Suite 1C, Saratoga Springs, NY 12866 (Oswald, Phillip)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' request #12 for a conference regarding their motion to remand this matter for lack of diversity jurisdiction #13 . The current briefing schedule on the motion to remand is ADJOURNED and the parties are directed to confer and file a status report by June 3, 2021, as to whether there is general diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a)(1), see Serrano v. 180 Connect, Inc., 478 F.3d 1018, 1021 n.4 (9th Cir. 2007) ("Federal diversity jurisdiction still exists for other class actions that satisfy the general diversity jurisdiction provision of 1332(a)."); see also 2:1, Subject matter jurisdiction requirementsDiversity of citizenship issues, 1 McLaughlin on Class Actions 2:1 (17th ed.) ("The [CAFA] did not preempt other valid bases for the assertion of jurisdiction over class actions." (citing Exxon Mobil Corp. v. Allapattah Servs., Inc., 545 U.S. 546, 572 (2005)), because the diversity of an LLC is based on the citizenship of its members, not its principal place of business, see Baverische Landesbank, N.Y. Branch v. Aladdin Capital Mgmt. LLC, 692 F.3d 42, 49 (2d Cir. 2012) (explaining that unlike corporations, "a limited liability company... takes the citizenship of each of its members"), and, according to Defendants, no member of the Defendant LLCs are citizens of New York, (see Dkt. No. 1, 6-10). The Court will set a briefing schedule or conference if necessary following the filing of the status report. So Ordered by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 5/19/2021. (nmk)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' #15 Letter Request seeking an adjournment of the deadline to file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint in this matter. The deadline for Defendants to file a response to the Complaint is ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 5/19/2021. (mab)
May 17, 2021 Filing 15 Letter Motion from James P. Ray for Norlite, LLC, Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC requesting extension of time to respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Judge Brenda K. Sannes and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Ray, James)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #11 Letter Request seeking an adjournment of the deadlines in this matter under General Order #25. The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for May 21, 2021 before the undersigned and the deadlines for the parties to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on the Motion to Remand. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 5/14/2021. (mab)
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Margaret Franklin, Audrey Anna Gallardo, Debra Hill, Jennifer Malinowski, Brittany McNair, David Olivencia, Christopher Sevinsky, Ed Sokol, Chelsea Sturtevant. Motion returnable before Judge Brenda K. Sannes and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart Response to Motion due by 6/4/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/11/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Phillip A. Oswald, Esq. in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, to Drop Parties, and for Fees and Costs, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F, #8 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, to Drop Parties, and for Fees and Costs) (Oswald, Phillip)
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 Letter Motion from Phillip Oswald, Esq. for Margaret Franklin, Audrey Anna Gallardo, Debra Hill, Jennifer Malinowski, Brittany McNair, David Olivencia, Christopher Sevinsky, Ed Sokol, Chelsea Sturtevant requesting a conference pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a)(2) submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Oswald, Phillip)
May 11, 2021 Filing 11 Letter Motion from Phillip Oswald, Esq. for Margaret Franklin, Audrey Anna Gallardo, Debra Hill, Jennifer Malinowski, Brittany McNair, David Olivencia, Christopher Sevinsky, Ed Sokol, Chelsea Sturtevant requesting an adjournment of the current deadlines under the G.O. 25 Filing Order submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Oswald, Phillip)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Based upon the agreement of the parties, Defendants' #9 Letter Request seeking an extension of time to file a response to the Complaint in this matter is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a response on or before May 19, 2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 4/23/2021. (mab)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 Letter Motion from James P. Ray for Norlite, LLC, Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC requesting extension of time to respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Judge Brenda K. Sannes and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Steward . (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)(Ray, James)
April 20, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norlite, LLC, Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC re #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, (Ray, James)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norlite, LLC, Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC re #5 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Ray, James)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC. (Ray, James)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC. (Ray, James)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Norlite, LLC. (Ray, James)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/21/2021 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/14/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
April 19, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Norlite, LLC answer due 4/23/2021; Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC answer due 4/23/2021; Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC answer due 4/23/2021. (mgh)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Margaret Franklin, Audrey Anna Gallardo, Debra Hill, Jennifer Malinowski, Brittany McNair, David Olivencia, Margaret Sevinsky, Ed Sokol, Chelsea Sturtevant. (mgh)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albany County Supreme Court, case number 902279-21 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5496488) filed by Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC, Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC, Norlite, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et al v. Norlite, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC
Represented By: James Patrick Ray
Represented By: Wystan M Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norlite, LLC
Represented By: James Patrick Ray
Represented By: Wystan M Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC
Represented By: James Patrick Ray
Represented By: Wystan M Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Sokol
Represented By: Phillip A. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Anna Gallardo
Represented By: Phillip A. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Sturtevant
Represented By: Phillip A. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany McNair
Represented By: Phillip A. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Franklin
Represented By: Phillip A. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Hill
Represented By: Phillip A. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Olivencia
Represented By: Phillip A. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Sevinsky
Represented By: Phillip A. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Malinowski
Represented By: Phillip A. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sevinsky
Represented By: Phillip A. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?