Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00462
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Uslaner, Brittany)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for U.S. Attorney General's Office)(hmr)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (Uslaner, Brittany)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.. (Uslaner, Brittany)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (Uslaner, Brittany)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/28/2021 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/21/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr) Modified on 4/27/2021 (jel, ).
April 26, 2021 TEXT NOTICE: Proposed Summonses were missing from the original filing for the U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney. Please electronically file proposed summonses to this case using the event Request for Issuance of Summonses. (hmr)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The United States of America (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5503522) filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Brittany Rose Uslaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?