Conley v. Anjanta Pharma USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Conley
Defendant: Heritage Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Novitium Pharma, LLC, PAI Holdings, LLC, Sandoz, Inc., L. Perrigo Co., Auro Health, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Amerisource Health Services, LLC, Wockhardt USA, LLC, Granules USA, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Lannett Co., Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc., Ranbaxy, Inc., Wockhardt USA, Inc., Strides Pharma, Inc., Perrigo Company, PLC, Perrigo Research & Development Company, One or More John Doe's, Apotex Corporation, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., VKT Pharma, Inc., Nostrum Laboratories, Inc., Torrent Pharma, Inc., Anjanta Pharma USA, Inc. and Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00463
Filed: April 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 Letter Motion from Plaintiff for Sandra Conley requesting Transfer to Related MDL submitted to Judge Gary L. Sharpe . (Ryder, Aaron)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 7/26/2021 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/19/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Amerisource Health Services, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anjanta Pharma USA, Inc., Apotex Corporation, Auro Health, LLC, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA, Granules USA, Inc., Heritage Pharmaceuticals, Inc., L. Perrigo Co., Lannett Co., Inc., Nostrum Laboratories, Inc., Novitium Pharma, LLC, PAI Holdings, LLC, Perrigo Company, PLC, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Ranbaxy, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Strides Pharma, Inc., Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Torrent Pharma, Inc., VKT Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Wockhardt USA, Inc., Wockhardt USA, LLC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #2 Summons Issued as to Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., #3 Summons Issued as to Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., #4 Summons Issued as to Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA, #5 Summons Issued as to L. Perrigo Co., #6 Summons Issued as to Nostrum Laboratories, Inc., #7 Summons Issued as to PAI Holdings, LLC, #8 Summons Issued as to Perrigo Company, PLC, #9 Summons Issued as to Ranbaxy, Inc., #10 Summons Issued as to Strides Pharma, Inc., #11 Summons Issued as to Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc., #12 Summons Issued as to Watson Laboratories, Inc., #13 Summons Issued as to Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #14 Summons Issued as to Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, #15 Summons Issued as to Amerisource Health Services, LLC, #16 Summons Issued as to Apotex Corporation, #17 Summons Issued as to Auro Health, LLC, #18 Summons Issued as to Granules USA, Inc., #19 Summons Issued as to Heritage Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #20 Summons Issued as to Lannett Co., Inc., #21 Summons Issued as to Novitium Pharma, LLC, #22 Summons Issued as to Perrigo Research & Development Company, #23 Summons Issued as to Sandoz, Inc., #24 Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #25 Summons Issued as to Torrent Pharma, Inc., #26 Summons Issued as to Wockhardt USA, LLC, #27 Summons Issued as to Wockhardt USA, Inc., #28 Summons Issued as to VKT Pharma, Inc.)(map)
April 26, 2021 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named a John Doe Party within the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue a summons for service of process on "John Doe" defendants at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain the defendants identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (map)
April 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Amerisource Health Services, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anjanta Pharma USA, Inc., Apotex Corporation, Auro Health, LLC, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA, Granules USA, Inc., Heritage Pharmaceuticals, Inc., L. Perrigo Co., Lannett Co., Inc., Nostrum Laboratories, Inc., Novitium Pharma, LLC, One or More John Doe's, PAI Holdings, LLC, Perrigo Company, PLC, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Ranbaxy, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Strides Pharma, Inc., Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Torrent Pharma, Inc., VKT Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Wockhardt USA, Inc., Wockhardt USA, LLC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5503866) filed by Sandra Conley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: New York State Department of Health - Death Certificate, #2 Exhibit B: Letters Granted by Surrogate's Court Document, #3 Exhibit C: United States District Court Southern District of Florida - Short-Form Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conley v. Anjanta Pharma USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novitium Pharma, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAI Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Perrigo Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auro Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisource Health Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wockhardt USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granules USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lannett Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranbaxy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wockhardt USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strides Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Company, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Research & Development Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One or More John Doe's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VKT Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nostrum Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anjanta Pharma USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Conley
Represented By: Aaron J. Ryder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?