Loggins v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Plaintiff: Jessica Loggins
Defendant: Beech Nut Nutritional Company and Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00483
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
2 Judge: Brenda K Sannes
3 Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Green Comite on behalf of Jessica Loggins (Comite, Erin)
May 24, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Will Wright on behalf of Jessica Loggins (Wright, Will)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER correcting the caption to reflect the proper name for Beach-Nut Nutrition Company and consolidating this action under the Lead Action (1:21-cv-133). Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 5/20/2021. (amt)
May 20, 2021 Pursuant to the #33 Stipulation and Order, this action is now consolidated under the LEAD CASE (1:21-cv-133). All future filings shall be made in the LEAD CASE. NO FURTHER DOCKETING SHALL BE DONE IN THIS CASE. (amt)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER granting #29 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of William C. Wright, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 5/19/2021. (tab)
May 19, 2021 Filing 31 Supplemental Admission documents re: #29 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Guglielmo, Joseph)
May 18, 2021 Filing 30 STIPULATION to consolidate this case with the Consolidated Action, correct Beech-Nut name in caption and extend Beech-Nut's time to answer complaint by Beech Nut Nutritional Company submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
May 18, 2021 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #29 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of William C. Wright. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
May 12, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of William C. Wright Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5522170. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment, #2 Admission Papers) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Guglielmo, Joseph)
May 12, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P Guglielmo on behalf of Jessica Loggins (Guglielmo, Joseph)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy and Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel for all further proceedings. Judge Brenda K. Sannes, Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 5/4/2021. (amt)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting the #25 Notice of Related Case. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 5/4/2021. (amt)
May 3, 2021 Filing 25 Notice of Related Case by Beech Nut Nutritional Company submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes . All parties are in agreement. Objections due by 5/10/2021 (McCarthy, Kathleen)
April 28, 2021 Filing 24 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beech Nut Nutritional Company identifying Corporate Parent Hero Beteiligungen AG, Corporate Parent Hero USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Hero AG, Corporate Parent Schwartau International GmbH, Corporate Parent AOH Nahrungsmittel GmbH & Co. KG for Beech Nut Nutritional Company.. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
April 28, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen E. McCarthy on behalf of Beech Nut Nutritional Company (McCarthy, Kathleen)
April 28, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant; Attorney Harold E. Franklin, Jr. Esq., Email address is hfranklin@kslaw.com. Phone number is 404-572-4600. Admissions due by 5/12/2021. (plp)
April 28, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff; Attorney William Charles Wright, Esq., Email address is willwright@wrightlawoffice.com. Phone number is 561-514-0901. Admissions due by 5/12/2021. (plp)
April 28, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff; Attorney Daniel Patrick Faherty, Esq., Email address is cguntner@ctrfa.com. Phone number is 321-269-6833. Admissions due by 5/12/2021. (plp)
April 28, 2021 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:21-cv-00442. electronically transferred when case opened
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Transfer Case. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this matter to the Northern District of New York and thereafter to close the case. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/15/2021. (JBS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of New York by both parties. (Franklin, Harold) Modified on 4/14/2021 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Beech Nut Nutritional Company identifying Corporate Parent Hero USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Hero Beteiligungen AG, Corporate Parent Hero AG, Corporate Parent Schwartau International GmbH, Corporate Parent AOH Nahrungsmittel GmbH & Co. KG for Beech Nut Nutritional Company.. (Franklin, Harold) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold E. Franklin, Jr on behalf of Beech Nut Nutritional Company (Franklin, Harold) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 4/1/21 by Jessica Loggins as to Beech Nut Nutritional Company. (RDO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Filing 13 (WRONG EVENT CODE. REFILED AT #14 ) CERTIFICATE of service by Jessica Loggins . (Wright, William) Modified on 4/7/2021 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #8 Order to show cause. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/5/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Order to show cause filed by Jessica Loggins. (Wright, William) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jessica Loggins. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Appendix MDL Related Actions)(Wright, William) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Jessica Loggins. (Wright, William) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Jessica Loggins. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's Order #3 . Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE and file her response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal without prejudice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/1/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Faherty on behalf of Jessica Loggins (Faherty, Daniel) Text modified on 3/23/2021 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Beech Nut Nutritional Company. (RDO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jessica Loggins. (Wright, William) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER: The parties are DIRECTED to confer regarding deadlines pertinent to a motion for class certification and advise the Court of agreeable deadlines in their case management report. The deadlines should include a deadline for (1) disclosure of expert reports - class action, plaintiff and defendant; (2) discovery - class action; (3) motion for class certification; (4) response to motion for class certification; and (5) reply to motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/12/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/12/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:21-cv-0442-PGB-LRH. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17979263) filed by Jessica Loggins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wright, William) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/28/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loggins v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Loggins
Represented By: Will Wright
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech Nut Nutritional Company
Represented By: Kathleen E. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Represented By: Kathleen E. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?