Douglas v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Plaintiff: Mieshia Douglas
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00511
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Pursuant to the #8 Stipulation and Order, this action is now consolidated under the LEAD CASE (1:21-cv-133). All future filings shall be made in the LEAD CASE. NO FURTHER DOCKETING SHALL BE DONE IN THIS CASE. (amt)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting the #6 Stipulation to Extent time to Answer and Consolidate filed by Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 5/17/2021. (pjh, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 5/14/2021. (amt)
May 14, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk added Hero USA, Inc., Hero Beteiligungen AG, Hero AG, Schwartau International GmbH, and AOH Nahrungsmittel GmbH & Co. KG as Corporate Parents to Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. (pjh, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to waive service and consolidate case with Thomas 21cv0133 by Beech-Nut Nutrition Company submitted to Judge Thomas J. McAvoy. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen E. McCarthy on behalf of Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (McCarthy, Kathleen)
May 6, 2021 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 1:21-cv-00133-TJM-CFH; 1:21-cv-00167-TJM-CFH; 1:21-cv-00183-TJM-CFH; 1:21-cv-00186-TJM-CFH; 1:21-cv-00200-TJM-CFH; 1:21-cv-00213-TJM-CFH; 1:21-cv-00227-TJM-CFH; 1:21-cv-00229-TJM-CFH; 1:21-cv-00258-TJM-CFH; 1:21-cv-00271-TJM-CFH; 1:21-cv-00283-TJM-CFH; 1:21-cv-00285-TJM-CFH; 1:21-cv-00334-TJM-CFH. (pjh, )
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/2/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/26/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. (pjh, )
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5513355) filed by Mieshia Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Represented By: Kathleen E. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mieshia Douglas
Represented By: Blake G. Abbott
Represented By: Eric Poulin
Represented By: Roy T. Willey, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?